Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP3525235 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201910104606 EP18208851



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
KR20190098014Global Dossier 21.08.2019A
Priority number Date
KR20180017070 12.02.2018
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US2019252756Global Dossier 15.08.2019A1
Priority number Date
KR20180017070 12.02.2018
KR20180069209 15.06.2018
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CN110167316Global Dossier 23.08.2019A
Priority number Date
KR20180017070 12.02.2018
KR20180069209 15.06.2018
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP3525235Global Dossier 14.08.2019A1
Priority number Date
KR20180017070 12.02.2018
KR20180069209 15.06.2018