Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3468173

EP3468173 - MODELESS VIDEO AND STILL FRAME CAPTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 21.09.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.09.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Apple Inc.
One Apple Park Way
Cupertino, CA 95014 / US
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / SILVERSTEIN, D. Amnon
c/o Apple Inc.
One Apple Park Way
Mail Stop 74-3PA
Cupertino, CA 95014 / US
02 / GO, Shun Wai
c/o Apple Inc.
One Apple Park Way
Mail Stop 74-3PA
Cupertino, CA 95014 / US
03 / LIM, Suk Hwan
c/o Apple Inc.
One Apple Park Way
Mail Stop 74-3PA
Cupertino, CA 95014 / US
04 / MILLET, Timothy J.
c/o Apple Inc.
One Apple Park Way
Mail Stop 74-3PA
Cupertino, CA 95014 / US
05 / CHEN, Ting
c/o Apple Inc.
One Apple Park Way
Mail Stop 74-3PA
Cupertino, CA 95014 / US
06 / NI, Bin
c/o Apple Inc.
One Apple Park Way
Mail Stop 74-3PA
Cupertino, CA 95014 / US
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)Lang, Johannes
Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB
Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte
Prinzregentenplatz 7
81675 München / DE
[2019/15]
Application number, filing date18208921.926.09.2014
[2019/15]
Priority number, dateUS20131408239018.11.2013         Original published format: US201314082390
[2019/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3468173
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/15]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.01.2019
ClassificationInternational:H04N7/01, H04N5/232
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:MODUSLOSE VIDEO- UND BILDERFASSUNG[2019/15]
English:MODELESS VIDEO AND STILL FRAME CAPTURE[2019/15]
French:CAPTURE D'IMAGE VIDÉO ET D'IMAGE FIXE SANS MODE[2019/15]
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
28.11.2018Examination requested  [2019/15]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP14784572.1  / EP3072290
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
28.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
28.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
13.09.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[I]US2003147640  (VOSS JAMES S [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0024], [0027];; figure 1 * * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0050] *;
 [I]US2006165179  (FEUER ARIE [IL], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0026]; claims 17-20 *;
 [I]EP2654288  (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0055]; figures 1-6, 8-10; claims 1-15 * * paragraph [0095] - paragraph [0112] * * paragraph [0097] - paragraph [0101] *