Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP3468173 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3468173



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 128
10.10.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
10.10.2019 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
10.10.2019 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
10.10.2019 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
10.10.2019 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 2
10.10.2019 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 6
10.10.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
15.04.2019 Invitation to confirm maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 2
13.03.2019 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
30.01.2019 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
24.01.2019 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
24.01.2019 European search opinion Search / examination 5
24.01.2019 European search report Search / examination 2
24.01.2019 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
14.01.2019 Search started Search / examination 1
18.12.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
18.12.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
18.12.2018 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 2
12.12.2018 Deficiency in designation of inventor Search / examination 1
28.11.2018 Abstract Search / examination 1
28.11.2018 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
28.11.2018 Claims Search / examination 3
28.11.2018 Description Search / examination 16
28.11.2018 Drawings Search / examination 7
28.11.2018 General enquiry Search / examination 1
28.11.2018 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5
08.06.2015 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 55