Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP3468173


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
21.10.2019 Amendment by applicant
17.09.2019 New entry: Renewal fee paid
10.04.2019 Deletion - The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established
10.04.2019 Request for examination filed published on  10.04.2019  [2019/15]
08.03.2019 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  10.04.2019  [2019/15]
08.03.2019 The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established
08.03.2019 Request for examination filed published on  10.04.2019  [2019/15]
01.12.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
29.11.2018 Change - representative