Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3471386

EP3471386 - ELECTRONIC DEVICE AND METHOD FOR DISPLAYING SERVICE INFORMATION IN ELECTRONIC DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  09.08.2019
Database last updated on 21.09.2019
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip09.08.2019The date on which the examining division becomes responsible has been established 
09.08.2019Request for examination filedpublished on 11.09.2019  [2019/37]
09.08.2019Change - designated statespublished on 11.09.2019  [2019/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
129, Samsung-ro
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si
Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / JUNG, Ji-Hyun
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
129 Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu
16677 Suwon-si / KR
02 / JUNG, Bu-Seop
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
129 Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu
16677 Suwon-si / KR
03 / BASTIN, Edwin Joseph Vimal
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
129 Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu
16677 Suwon-si / KR
04 / LEE, Seung-Min
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
129 Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu
16677 Suwon-si / KR
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)HGF Limited
Saviour House
9 St. Saviourgate
York YO1 8NQ / GB
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date18208923.518.11.2013
[2019/16]
Priority number, dateKR2012013050316.11.2012         Original published format: KR 20120130503
KR2013013038130.10.2013         Original published format: KR 20130130381
EP2013019318215.11.2013         Original published format: EP 13193182
[2019/26]
Former [2019/16]KR20120130503U16.11.2012
KR20130130381U30.10.2013
EP2013019318215.11.2013
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3471386
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/16]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.01.2019
ClassificationInternational:H04M1/725, H04L29/08, H04W4/21, H04W4/80
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/37]
Former [2019/16]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR ANZEIGE VON SERVICEINFORMATIONEN IN EINER ELEKTRONISCHEN VORRICHTUNG[2019/16]
English:ELECTRONIC DEVICE AND METHOD FOR DISPLAYING SERVICE INFORMATION IN ELECTRONIC DEVICE[2019/16]
French:DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE ET PROCÉDÉ D'AFFICHAGE D'INFORMATIONS DE SERVICE DANS UN DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE[2019/16]
Examination procedure05.08.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
05.08.2019Examination requested  [2019/37]
05.08.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP13193285.7  / EP2733915
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
28.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
28.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
28.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
Cited inInternational search[I]US2009214036  (SHEN HUI [US] ET AL) [I] 1-14 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0069] *
 [A]US2012038781  (IM JINSUNG [KR] ET AL) [A] 1-14 * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0099] - paragraph [0152] *