Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3498231

EP3498231 - RANGE OF FEMORAL IMPLANTS AND FULL KNEE PROSTHESIS COMPRISING A FEMORAL IMPLANT SELECTED FROM SUCH A RANGE OF FEMORAL IMPLANTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.11.2019
Database last updated on 18.02.2020
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  17.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.11.2019The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established 
15.11.2019Request for examination filedpublished on 18.12.2019  [2019/51]
15.11.2019Change - designated statespublished on 18.12.2019  [2019/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Amplitude
11 cours Jacques Offenbach
Zone Mozart 2
26000 Valence / FR
For all designated states
SCORE 2
71 Cours Engénie
69003 Lyon / FR
[2019/25]
Inventor(s)01 / CHAVANE, Hervé
487 Chemin du Panorama
69300 CALUIRE ET CUIRE / FR
02 / ROLLIER, Jean-Charles
134 route de Sechenal
74370 SAINT MARTIN BELLEVUE / FR
03 / HAUCK, Werner
Beethoven Str. 37 A
LANDSTUHL (Allemagne) / DE
04 / JACQUOT, Laurent
305 route de la Pallaz
74370 CHARVONNEX / FR
05 / CHEVILLOTTE, Christophe Jean François Marie
35 Avenue de Mortières
71640 GIVRY / FR
06 / DELALANDE, Jean-Luc Christian Jules
505 Rue de Champbourdon
45560 SAINT-DENIS-EN-VAL / FR
07 / DENJEAN, Stéphane
Chemin du Chêne
Somméré
71960 LA ROCHE VINEUSE / FR
08 / GAILLARD, Thierry Alain Michel
71 cours Eugénie
69003 LYON / FR
09 / TAYOT, Olivier Louis
27 Chemin des Villas
69300 CALUIRE-ET-CUIRE / FR
10 / CHATAIN, Frédéric Georges Marie
189 Chemin des Communaux
38190 BERNIN / FR
11 / CHARLIER, Hervé
32 Haute Rue
14763 GLABAIS / BE
12 / VANCABEKE, Michel
Avenue des nations unies 82
1410 WATERLOO / BE
13 / REGENET, Jérémy
3 Bis rue du Four Banal
26300 BESAYES / FR
 [2019/25]
Representative(s)Chevalier, Renaud Philippe , et al
Cabinet Germain & Maureau
BP 6153
69466 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR
[2019/25]
Application number, filing date18208954.028.11.2018
[2019/25]
Priority number, dateFR2017006136929.11.2017         Original published format: FR 1761369
[2019/25]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3498231
Date:19.06.2019
Language:FR
[2019/25]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.05.2019
ClassificationInternational:A61F2/38
[2019/25]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/51]
Former [2019/25]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:FEMORALIMPLANTATSORTIMENT UND KNIE-TOTALPROTHESE, DIE EIN AUSGEWÄHLTES FEMORALIMPLANTAT AUS DIESEM FEMORALIMPLANTATSORTIMENT UMFASST[2019/25]
English:RANGE OF FEMORAL IMPLANTS AND FULL KNEE PROSTHESIS COMPRISING A FEMORAL IMPLANT SELECTED FROM SUCH A RANGE OF FEMORAL IMPLANTS[2019/25]
French:GAMME D'IMPLANTS FÉMORAUX ET PROTHÈSE TOTALE DE GENOU COMPRENANT UN IMPLANT FÉMORAL SÉLECTIONNÉ DANS UNE TELLE GAMME D'IMPLANTS FÉMORAUX[2019/25]
Examination procedure13.11.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
13.11.2019Examination requested  [2019/51]
13.11.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Documents cited:Search[XA]US2014142713  (WRIGHT ABRAHAM P [US], et al) [X] 15 * paragraphs [0100] - [0126] * [A] 1-14;
 [A]FR2955482  (SCHWARTZ CLAUDE [FR], et al) [A] 1-14 * page 5, line 25 - page 8, line 25 *;
 [A]GB2296443  (JBS SA [FR]) [A] 1-15 * page 7, lines 7-14 *