Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3473260

EP3473260 - ACELLULAR TISSUE MATRIX COMPOSITIONS FOR TISSUE REPAIR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been published
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 21.09.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip31.07.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LifeCell Corporation
5 Giralda Farms
Madison, New Jersey 07940 / US
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / OWENS, Rick T
1127 Monroe Drive Stewartsville
New Jersey, 08886 / US
02 / SUN, Wendell
2308 Birch Court Warrington
Pennsylvania / US
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Lau, Sarah Jane , et al
Kilburn & Strode LLP
Lacon London
84 Theobalds Road
London WC1X 8NL / GB
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date18208957.309.07.2008
[2019/17]
Priority number, dateUS200794879307P10.07.2007         Original published format: US 94879307 P
[2019/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3473260
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.03.2019
ClassificationInternational:A61K35/36, A61K9/19, C08L89/06, A61L31/00, A61L27/36, A61L27/16, A61L27/18
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2019/17]
TitleGerman:AZELLULÄRE GEWEBEMATRIXZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ZUR GEWEBEREPARATUR[2019/17]
English:ACELLULAR TISSUE MATRIX COMPOSITIONS FOR TISSUE REPAIR[2019/17]
French:COMPOSITIONS DE MATRICE TISSULAIRE ACELLULAIRE POUR LA RÉPARATION TISSULAIRE[2019/17]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP08772486.0  / EP2162142
EP15197130.6  / EP3011962
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
28.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
28.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 05
28.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
28.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
28.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 08
28.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 09
28.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 10
31.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 11
29.07.2019Renewal fee patent year 12
Documents cited:Search[I]US2005013872  (FREYMAN TOBY [US]) [I] 1-15 * page 4, paragraphs 33-34 * * page 5, paragraph 51 * * page 6, paragraphs 59-61 * * page 8, paragraph 75 - page 9, paragraph 88 * * page 11, paragraphs 112-116 *;
 [A]US2003225355  (BUTLER CHARLES E [US]) [A] 1-15 * page 5, paragraph 45 - page 6, paragraph 47 * * page 8, paragraphs 72-73 * * claim - *;
 [A]US2007088434  (FRANK ROBERT E [US]) [A] 1-15 * page 5, paragraph 55 *;
 [A]US2006153815  (SEYDA AGNIESZKA [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * page 4, paragraph 37 - page 5, paragraph 50 * * page 6, paragraph 58 - page 7, paragraph 60 * * claim - *;
 [A]US2002091445  (SUNG HSING-WEN [TW], et al) [A] 1-15 * page 3, paragraph 41 - page 4, paragraph 42 * * claim - *
by applicantUS2005028228
 US6166288
 US4865871
 US5366616
 US6933326
 US2003035843
 US5336616
 US4619257
 US4676070
 US4799361
 US4964280
 US5024838
 US5044165
 US5154007
 US6194136
 US5364756
 US5780295
    - CAMPBELL et al., Nature, (19960000), vol. 380, pages 64 - 66
    - FRANKS, Proc. Inst. Refrigeration, (19940000), vol. 91, pages 32 - 39