Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3495709

EP3495709 - SUPPORTING FRAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  13.12.2019
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  10.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip20.12.2019Change - prioritypublished on 22.01.2020  [2020/04]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Syncmold Enterprise Corp.
9F., No.168, Jiankang Rd.
Zhonghe Dist.
New Taipei City / TW
[2019/24]
Inventor(s)01 / YEN, Ching-Hui
9F., No.168, Jiankang Rd., Zhonghe Dist.
New Taipei City / TW
02 / YEH, Chien-Cheng
9F., No.168, Jiankang Rd., Zhonghe Dist.
New Taipei City / TW
03 / LU, Chin-Chuan
9F., No.168, Jiankang Rd., Zhonghe Dist.
New Taipei City / TW
04 / LEE, Yi-Xin
9F., No.168, Jiankang Rd., Zhonghe Dist.
New Taipei City / TW
 [2019/24]
Representative(s)Michalski Hüttermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Speditionstraße 21
40221 Düsseldorf / DE
[2019/24]
Application number, filing date18209122.329.11.2018
[2019/24]
Priority number, dateTW20170218102U06.12.2017         Original published format: TW 106218102 U
[2020/04]
Former [2019/24]TW10618102U06.12.2017
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3495709
Date:12.06.2019
Language:EN
[2019/24]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.05.2019
ClassificationInternational:F16M11/10, F16M11/20, F16M11/38
[2019/24]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2020/03]
Former [2019/24]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:STÜTZRAHMEN[2019/24]
English:SUPPORTING FRAME[2019/24]
French:CADRE DE SUPPORT[2019/24]
Examination procedure06.12.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
10.12.2019Examination requested  [2020/03]
10.12.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Documents cited:Search[A]US2017303415  (DEILY MIKE F [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * paragraphs [0021] , [0022] , [0024] , [0059]; figures 5B-10C,17B *;
 [A]TWM549296U  (SYNCMOLD ENTPR CORP [TW]) [A] 1-11;
 US2019017650  [ ] (YEN CHING-HUI [TW], et al) [ ] * paragraphs [0024] - [0030] - [0 33] , [0034] , [0037] , [0028]; figures 1-7 *;
 [A]US2015265048  (LINDBLAD SHAUN C [US]) [A] 1-11 * paragraphs [0021] - [0030] - [0033] - [0035] - [0038] - [0039] - [0041] , [0044] - [0046]; figures 1-10 *;
 [A]US2547532  (MENDELSOHN WILLIAM A) [A] 1-11 * figure 2 *
by applicantUS7252277