Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3473278

EP3473278 - METHOD FOR ENZYMATIC TREATMENT OF TISSUE PRODUCTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been published
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 14.09.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip04.05.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LifeCell Corporation
5 Giralda Farms
Madison, New Jersey 07940 / US
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / CHEN, Yi
62 Canal View Drive
Lawrenceville, NJ 08648 / US
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Gowshall, Jonathan Vallance
Forresters IP LLP
Skygarden
Erika-Mann-Strasse 11
80636 München / DE
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date18209569.527.04.2012
[2019/17]
Priority number, dateUS201161479937P28.04.2011         Original published format: US 201161479937 P
[2019/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3473278
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.01.2019
ClassificationInternational:A61L27/24, A61L27/56
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR ENZYMATISCHEN BEHANDLUNG VON TISSUEPRODUKTEN[2019/17]
English:METHOD FOR ENZYMATIC TREATMENT OF TISSUE PRODUCTS[2019/17]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT ENZYMATIQUE DE PRODUITS TISSULAIRES[2019/17]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP12720056.6  / EP2701755
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
30.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
30.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
30.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
30.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
29.04.2019Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[A]WO0191671  (CROSSCART INC [US]) [A] 1-7 * page 6 - page 9 * * page 12, line 29 - line 31 *;
 [A]US2011021753  (HUANG LYNN L H [TW]) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *;
 [I]US2005260176  (AYARES DAVID [US], et al) [I] 1-7 * paragraphs [0302] , [ 0308] *
 [A]  - Aurelia Ionescu ET AL, "EFFECT OF PAPAIN AND BROMELIN ON MUSCLE AND COLLAGEN PROTEINS IN BEEF MEAT", The Annals of the University Dunarea de Jos of Galati, (20080101), pages 9 - 16, URL: http://www.ann.ugal.ro/tpa/Anale 2008/Full paper AIonescu.pdf, (20120621), XP055030665 [A] 1-7 * Materials and Methods; Results and Discussion *
by applicantUS6166288
    - U. GALILI et al., J. Biol. Chem., (19880000), vol. 263, page 17755
    - U. GALILI et al., Infect. Immun., (19880000), vol. 56, page 1730
    - R. M. HAMADEH et al., J. Clin. Invest., (19920000), vol. 89, page 1223
    - U. GALILI et al., Immunology Today, (19930000), vol. 14, page 480
    - M. SANDRIN et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19930000), vol. 90, page 11391
    - H. GOOD et al., Transplant. Proc., (19920000), vol. 24, page 559
    - B. H. COLLINS et al., J. Immunol., (19950000), vol. 154, page 5500
    - XU, HUI. et al., "A Porcine-Derived Acellular Dermal Scaffold that Supports Soft Tissue Regeneration: Removal of Terminal Galactose-a-(1,3)-Galactose and Retention of Matrix Structure", Tissue Engineering, (20090000), vol. 15, doi:doi:10.1089/ten.tea.2008.0384, pages 1 - 13, XP002528175

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1089/ten.tea.2008.0384
 US20070896594