Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3473713

EP3473713 - POLYPEPTIDES HAVING TRANSGALACTOSYLATING ACTIVITY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been published
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 21.09.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.06.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
DuPont Nutrition Biosciences ApS
Langebrogade 1
1411 Copenhagen K / DK
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / CRAMER, Jacob Flyvholm
Kragelunds Allé 10
8270 Højbjerg / DK
02 / LARSEN, Morten Krog
Borumtoften 4
8471 Sabro / DK
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date18209685.907.06.2013
[2019/17]
Priority number, dateUS201261657180P08.06.2012         Original published format: US 201261657180 P
EP2012017133508.06.2012         Original published format: EP 12171335
[2019/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3473713
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.01.2019
ClassificationInternational:C12N9/38
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
TitleGerman:POLYPEPTIDE MIT TRANSGALACTOSYLIERUNGSAKTIVITÄT[2019/17]
English:POLYPEPTIDES HAVING TRANSGALACTOSYLATING ACTIVITY[2019/17]
French:POLYPEPTIDES DOTÉS D'UNE ACTIVITÉ DE TRANSGALACTOSYLATION[2019/17]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP13727611.9  / EP2859098
EP17184821.1  / EP3305896
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
30.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
30.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 05
30.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
13.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[XY]WO0190317  (ARLA FOODS AMBA [DK]; JOERGENSEN FLEMMING [DK]; HANSEN OLEN CAI [DK];) [X] 1-10,12-15 * whole document esp. seq id no 2; pages 4-5, 7-8; Figure 1; and claims 11,18,26-27 * [Y] 1-15;
 [XDY]WO2009071539  (NOVOZYMES AS [DK]; CHR HANSEN AS [DK]; HENRIKSEN HANNE VANG [DK]; ERNS) [XD] 1-10,12-15 * whole document esp. seq id no 2, 3; pages 2,16,21; claims 1,13,14 * [Y] 1-15;
 [XY]WO2012010597  (ARLA FOODS AMBA [DK]; BERTELSEN HANS [DK]; LANGBORG WEJSE PETER [DK]) [X] 1-10,12-15 * whole document esp. seq id no 2; pages 2-3,30 * [Y] 1-15;
 [Y]  - O. HANSEN ET AL, "High-efficiency synthesis of oligosaccharides with a truncated ?-galactosidase from Bifidobacterium bifidum", APPLIED MICROBIOLOGY AND BIOTECHNOLOGY, DE, (20011201), vol. 57, no. 5-6, doi:10.1007/s00253-001-0845-z, ISSN 0175-7598, pages 647 - 652, XP055542920 [Y] 1-15 * whole document esp. page 647 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00253-001-0845-z
by applicantWO0190317
 WO2012010597
 WO2009071539
 US7371552
 US7166453
 US6890572
 US6667065
 US2007141693
 US2007072270
 US2007020731
 US2007020727
 US2006073583
 US2006019347
 US2006018997
 US2006008890
 US2006008888
 US2005137111
 US5874276
 US6022725
 US6268328
 EP0244234
 EP0215594
    - JORGENSEN et al., Appl. Microbiol. Biotechnol., (20010000), vol. 57, pages 647 - 652
    - R.D. FINN, J. MISTRY; J. TATE; P. COGGILL; A. HEGER; J.E. POLLINGTON; O.L. GAVIN; P. GUNESEKARAN; G. CERIC; K. FORSLUND; L. HOLM, "The Pfam protein families database", Nucleic Acids Research, (20100000), vol. 38, pages D211 - 222
    - ALTSCHUL et al., J. Mol. Biol., (19900000), vol. 215, pages 403 - 410
    - NEEDLEMAN, SAUL B.; WUNSCH, CHRISTIAN D., "A general method applicable to the search for similarities in the amino acid sequence of two proteins", Journal of Molecular Biology, (19700000), vol. 48, no. 3, doi:doi:10.1016/0022-2836(70)90057-4, pages 443 - 53, XP024011703

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0022-2836(70)90057-4
    - WIERENGA, FEBS Letters, (20010000), vol. 492, no. 3, pages 193 - 8
    - JENKINS, FEBS Letters, (19950000), vol. 362, no. 3, pages 281 - 5
    - HENRISSAT, Curr Opin Struct Biol, (19970000), vol. 7, no. 5, pages 637 - 44
    - Nucl. Acids Res., (20100000), vol. 38, no. 1, pages D211 - D222
    - Nucl. Acids Res., (20090000), vol. 37, no. 1, pages D211 - D215
    - R.D. FINN; J. MISTRY; J. TATE; P. COGGILL; A. HEGER; J.E. POLLINGTON; O.L. GAVIN; P. GUNESEKARAN; G. CERIC; K. FORSLUND, "The Pfam protein families database", Nucleic Acids Research, (20100000), vol. 38, pages D211 - 222
    - BOLTON; MCCARTHY, Proceedings of the National Academy of Sciences USA, (19620000), vol. 48, page 1390
    - BENNETT et al., MORE GENE MANIPULATIONS IN FUNGI, Academic Press, (19910000), pages 396 - 428
    - KELLEY et al., EMBO J., (19850000), vol. 4, pages 475 - 479
    - PENTTILA et al., Gene, (19870000), vol. 61, pages 155 - 164
    - CAMPBELL et al., Curr. Genet., (19890000), vol. 16, pages 53 - 56
    - HARKKI et al., Enzyme Microb. Technol., (19910000), vol. 13, pages 227 - 233
    - HARKKI et al., BioTechnol, (19890000), vol. 7, pages 596 - 603