blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3492902

EP3492902 - APPARATUS HAVING FUNCTION OF DILUTING SAMPLE AND METHOD FOR DILUTING SAMPLE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  10.07.2020
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  03.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip10.07.2020Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 12.08.2020  [2020/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Shimadzu Corporation
1 Nishinokyo-Kuwabaracho
Nakagyo-ku
Kyoto 604-8511 / JP
[2019/23]
Inventor(s)01 / NISHIO, Tatsuya
c/o Shimadzu Corporation
1, Nishinokyo-Kuwabara-cho
Nakagyo-ku
Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 6048511 / JP
 [2019/23]
Representative(s)Mewburn Ellis LLP
Aurora Building
Counterslip
Bristol BS1 6BX / GB
[N/P]
Former [2019/23]Mewburn Ellis LLP
City Tower
40 Basinghall Street
London EC2V 5DE / GB
Application number, filing date18209937.403.12.2018
[2019/23]
Priority number, dateJP2017023256404.12.2017         Original published format: JP 2017232564
[2019/23]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3492902
Date:05.06.2019
Language:EN
[2019/23]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.05.2019
ClassificationIPC:G01N1/38, G01N35/02, G01N35/10, // G01N35/00
[2019/23]
CPC:
G01N1/38 (EP,US); G01N35/1016 (US); G01N30/24 (US);
G01N35/025 (EP,US); G01N35/08 (US); G01N35/10 (EP,US);
G01N2035/00277 (EP,US); G01N2035/00465 (EP,US); G01N2035/1032 (US);
G01N2035/106 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/23]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG MIT FUNKTION ZUM VERDÜNNEN EINER PROBE UND VERFAHREN ZUM VERDÜNNEN EINER PROBE[2019/23]
English:APPARATUS HAVING FUNCTION OF DILUTING SAMPLE AND METHOD FOR DILUTING SAMPLE[2019/23]
French:APPAREIL DOTÉ D'UNE FONCTION DE DILUTION D'ÉCHANTILLON ET PROCÉDÉ DE DILUTION D'ÉCHANTILLON[2019/23]
Examination procedure03.12.2018Examination requested  [2019/23]
06.12.2019Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2020/33]
16.01.2020Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2020/33]
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0411620  (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [A] 1-4* the whole document *;
 [X]EP1650570  (MITSUBISHI KAGAKU IATRON INC [JP]) [X] 1-4 * paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0028] * * paragraph [0043] * * paragraph [0050] * * paragraph [0052] * * figures 1-4 *;
 [A]WO2017199432  (SHIMADZU CORP [JP]) [A] 1-4 * the whole document *
by applicantWO2014072979
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.