blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3499494

EP3499494 - METHOD FOR CONTROLLING SCREEN DISPLAY AND DEVICE USING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  23.09.2022
Database last updated on 18.05.2024
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  21.04.2020
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  20.12.2019
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  17.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip23.09.2022Refusal of applicationpublished on 26.10.2022  [2022/43]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Beijing Xiaomi Mobile Software Co., Ltd.
Room 01, Floor 9
Rainbow City Shopping Mall II of
China Resources
No. 68, Qinghe Middle Street, Haidian District
Beijing 100085 / CN
[2019/25]
Inventor(s)01 / LI, Guosheng
Beijing Xiaomi Mobile Software Co., Ltd.
Room 01, Floor 9, Rainbow City Shopping Mall II
of China Resources
NO. 68, Qinghe Middle Street Haidian District
Beijing, Beijing 100085 / CN
 [2019/25]
Representative(s)Kudlek, Franz Thomas, et al
Dehns Germany
Theresienstraße 6-8
80333 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2019/25]Kudlek, Franz Thomas
Dehns Germany
Theresienstraße 6-8
80333 München / DE
Application number, filing date18210126.104.12.2018
[2019/25]
Priority number, dateCN20171126520105.12.2017         Original published format: CN201711265201
[2019/25]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3499494
Date:19.06.2019
Language:EN
[2019/25]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.05.2019
ClassificationIPC:G09G3/34
[2019/25]
CPC:
G09G3/3406 (EP,US); G06F1/3265 (CN,KR); H04W52/027 (EP,CN,KR,US);
G06F1/32 (RU); G06F1/3218 (CN,KR); G06F1/329 (CN,KR);
G06F3/14 (RU); G06F3/1407 (CN,KR); H04M1/72448 (CN,KR);
H04M1/72484 (CN,KR); H04M1/725 (RU); H04W52/02 (RU);
G09G2320/0285 (EP,US); G09G2320/062 (EP,US); G09G2320/0626 (US);
G09G2320/0633 (EP,US); G09G2320/0646 (EP,US); G09G2320/066 (EP,US);
G09G2330/021 (EP,US); G09G2360/144 (US); G09G2360/145 (US);
G09G2370/022 (US); Y02D30/70 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2020/04]
Former [2019/25]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG EINER BILDSCHIRMANZEIGE UND VORRICHTUNG DAMIT[2019/25]
English:METHOD FOR CONTROLLING SCREEN DISPLAY AND DEVICE USING THE SAME[2019/25]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE D'AFFICHAGE D'ÉCRAN ET DISPOSITIF L'UTILISANT[2019/25]
Examination procedure18.12.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
18.12.2019Examination requested  [2020/04]
18.12.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
24.04.2020Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.08.2020Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.05.2022Application refused, date of legal effect [2022/43]
17.05.2022Date of oral proceedings
01.06.2022Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
13.06.2022Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2022/43]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.12.2020Renewal fee patent year 03
24.12.2021Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]EP1107221  (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [X] 1-14 * the whole document *;
 [X]US2007273714  (HODGE ANDREW BERT [US], et al) [X] 1-14 * the whole document *;
 [X]EP1892698  (SHARP KK [JP]) [X] 1-14* the whole document *;
 [X]EP2521119  (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [X] 1-14 * the whole document *;
 [X]US2017110069  (SHOSHAN YOEL [IL], et al) [X] 1-14 * the whole document *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.