Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3473866

EP3473866 - ROTARY PISTON ACTUATOR ANTI-ROTATION CONFIGURATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 14.09.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip10.04.2019Deletion - The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established 
10.04.2019Request for examination filedpublished on 24.04.2019  [2019/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Woodward, Inc.
1081 Woodward Way
Fort Collins, Colorado 80524 / US
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / SOBOLEWSKI, Pawel A.
1310 S. Arlington Heights Road
Arlington Heights, IL Illinois 60005 / US
02 / KIM, Joseph H.
24558 Montevista Circle
Valencia, CA California 91354 / US
03 / O'HARA, Robert P.
31923 Topaz Court
Castaic, CA California 91384 / US
04 / HYDARI, Shahbaz H.
738 S. Los Angeles Street 605
Los Angeles, CA California 90014 / US
05 / SZULYK, Zenon P.
405 Craig Court
Mount Prospect, IL Illinois 60056 / US
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Conroy, John
Fish & Richardson P.C.
Highlight Business Towers
Mies-van-der-Rohe-Straße 8
80807 München / DE
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date18210141.030.01.2015
[2019/17]
Priority number, dateUS20141449152319.09.2014         Original published format: US201414491523
[2019/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3473866
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.03.2019
ClassificationInternational:F15B15/12
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
TitleGerman:DREHAKTORANORDNUNG[2019/17]
English:ROTARY PISTON ACTUATOR ANTI-ROTATION CONFIGURATIONS[2019/17]
French:CONFIGURATION POUR VERIN ROTATIF[2019/17]
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
04.12.2018Examination requested  [2019/17]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP15703705.2  / EP3194794
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
04.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
27.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[XA]US2014238231  (KIM JOSEPH H [US] ET AL) [X] 1,2 * paragraph [0081] - paragraph [0105]; figures 1-48 * * paragraph [0204]; figure 32 * * paragraph [0206] * [A] 3-5,7-10;
 [A]US2014271296  (KIM JOSEPH H [US] ET AL) [A] 3,7 * figures 1-2b,4 *;
 [A]US3731546  (MACDONALD J) [A] 1-10 * column 3, paragraphs 24-43; figures 3,4 *;
 [A]US2009108129  (FLATT JAMES E [US]) [A] 7-10 * paragraphs [0072] - [0079]; figure 15 *;
 [A]GB771595  (SIMMS MOTOR UNITS LTD; GEORGE JOHN RACKHAM) [A] 7-10 * pages 1,2; figure 1 *