Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3470513

EP3470513 - SRM ASSAY TO INDICATE CANCER THERAPY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 14.09.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip31.08.2019Change - representative 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Expression Pathology, Inc.
9600 Medical Center Drive, Suite 300
Rockville, MD 20850 / US
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / KRIZMAN, David B.
24305 Welsh Road
Gaithersburg, MD 20882 / US
02 / HEMBROUGH, Todd
24336 Newberry Road
Gaithersburg, MD 20882 / US
03 / THYPARAMBIL, Sheeno
3730 Singleton Terrace
Frederick, MD 21704 / US
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)AWA Sweden AB
P.O. Box 45086
104 30 Stockholm / SE
[N/P]
Former [2019/16]Bohmann, Armin K.
Bohmann
Anwaltssozietät
Nymphenburger Straße 1
80335 München / DE
Application number, filing date18210192.318.03.2014
[2019/16]
Priority number, dateUS201361791833P15.03.2013         Original published format: US 201361791833 P
[2019/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3470513
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/16]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.02.2019
ClassificationInternational:C12N9/10, C12N9/12, G01N33/574, G01N33/68
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
TitleGerman:SRM-TEST ZUR ANZEIGE EINER KREBSTHERAPIE[2019/16]
English:SRM ASSAY TO INDICATE CANCER THERAPY[2019/16]
French:DOSAGE SRM AFIN D'INDIQUER UNE THÉRAPIE CONTRE LE CANCER[2019/16]
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
04.12.2018Examination requested  [2019/16]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP14763214.5  / EP2984176
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
04.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
04.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
26.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[A]JP2012197258  (UNIV TOHOKU) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2012208824  (RIMKUNAS VICTORIA MCGUINNESS [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * whole document, in particular par. 15, 87, 90, 110-126, 129, 130,153, 189, 190; table 2, 3 *;
 [A]WO2008127248  (CELL SIGNALING TECHNOLOGY INC [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * whole document, in particular p. 12, l. 28 - p. 13, l. 12; p. 52, l. 1 - p. 58, l. 24; p. 69, l. 22 - p. 76, l. 19; example 1; fig. 1 *;
 [A]US2013011408  (KRIZMAN DAVID B [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * whole document, in particular par. 4, 13-15 *;
 [A]WO2006127860  (EXPRESSION PATHOLOGY INC [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * whole document, in particular claims 1-19 *;
 [A]US2009215636  (KRIZMAN DAVID B [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * whole document, in particular example 1 *;
 [A]WO2012075318  (CELL SIGNALING TECHNOLOGY INC [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * whole document, in particular p. 7, l. 7 - p. 8, l. 6; p. 24, l. 16-29; p. 53, l. 31 - p. 60, l. 31; example 1 *;
 [A]WO2012019132  (CELL SIGNALING TECHNOLOGY INC [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * whole document, in particular par. 22, 85-103; claims 4, 17 *;
 [A]WO2009051846  (CELL SIGNALING TECHNOLOGY INC [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * whole document, in particular p. 28, l. 13 - p. 31, l. 34; example 1 *
by applicantUS7473532
 US7501286
 US7632686
    - GENG et al., J. Chromatography B, (20010000), vol. 752, pages 293 - 306