Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3470081

EP3470081 - METHODS FOR TREATING CANCER IN PATIENTS WITH ELEVATED LEVELS OF BIM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 19.09.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip10.04.2019Deletion - The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established 
10.04.2019Request for examination filedpublished on 17.04.2019  [2019/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Mayo Foundation for Medical Education and Research
200 First Street S.W.
Rochester, MN 55905 / US
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / DONG, Haidong
1814 Scenic Point Lane S.W.
Rochester, MN 55902-2533 / US
02 / HARRINGTON, Susan M.
4462 Durhan Lane N.W.
Rochester, MN 55901 / US
03 / KWON, Eugene D.
1407 Woodview Lane S.W.
Rochester, MN 55902 / US
04 / KRCO, Christopher J.
4008 Mary Lane N.W.
Rochester, MN 55901 / US
05 / LIU, Xin
12 Elton Ridge Court N.W.
Rochester, MN 55901 / US
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Kunz, Herbert
Fish & Richardson P.C.
Highlight Business Towers
Mies-van-der-Rohe-Straße 8
80807 München / DE
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date18210199.803.09.2014
[2019/16]
Priority number, dateUS201361885218P01.10.2013         Original published format: US 201361885218 P
[2019/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3470081
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/16]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.02.2019
ClassificationInternational:A61K39/395, A61K39/00, G01N33/53, C12Q1/68, C07K16/28
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON KREBS BEI PATIENTEN MIT ERHÖHTEN BIM-WERTEN[2019/16]
English:METHODS FOR TREATING CANCER IN PATIENTS WITH ELEVATED LEVELS OF BIM[2019/16]
French:PROCÉDÉS DE TRAITEMENT DU CANCER CHEZ DES PATIENTS PRÉSENTANT DES TAUX ÉLEVÉS DE BIM[2019/16]
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
04.12.2018Examination requested  [2019/16]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP14850189.3  / EP3052131
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
04.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
04.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[A]WO2013090552  (UNIV YALE [US]) [A] 1-8 * page 54, line 5 *;
 [I]  - TOPALIAN SUZANNE L ET AL, "Safety, activity, and immune correlates of anti-PD-1 antibody in cancer.", THE NEW ENGLAND JOURNAL OF MEDICINE 28 JUN 2012, (20120628), vol. 366, no. 26, ISSN 1533-4406, pages 2443 - 2454, XP002767416 [I] 1-6,8 * page 2452; figure B *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1056/NEJMoa1200690
 [A]  - BERRIEN-ELLIOTT MELISSA M ET AL, "Durable adoptive immunotherapy for leukemia produced by manipulation of multiple regulatory pathways of CD8+ T-cell tolerance.", CANCER RESEARCH 15 JAN 2013, (20130115), vol. 73, no. 2, ISSN 1538-7445, pages 605 - 616, XP002767417 [A] 1-8 * page 606, column left * * page 608, column right *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1158/0008-5472.CAN-12-2179
 [A]  - RACHEL M GIBBONS ET AL, "B7-H1 limits the entry of effector CD8 + T cells to the memory pool by upregulating Bim", ONCOIMMUNOLOGY, (20121001), vol. 1, no. 7, doi:10.4161/onci.20850, pages 1061 - 1073, XP055332328 [A] 1-8 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.4161/onci.20850
 [T]  - DRONCA ROXANA S ET AL, "T cell Bim levels reflect responses to anti-PD-1 cancer therapy.", JCI INSIGHT 05 MAY 2016, (20160505), vol. 1, no. 6, ISSN 2379-3708, XP002788154

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1172/jci.insight.86014
 [T]  - DRONCA ROXANA S ET AL, "BCL-2-interacting mediator of cell death (Bim) is a novel biomarker for response to anti-PD-1 therapy in patients with advanced melanoma.", IMMUNOTHERAPY 12 2016, (201612), vol. 8, no. 12, ISSN 1750-7448, pages 1351 - 1353, XP002788155

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.2217/imt-2016-0100
by applicantUS5530101
 US5565332
 US5585089
 US5639641
 US5693761
 US5693762
 US5733743
 US4816567
 US4935496
 US5502167
 US5558864
 US5693493
 US5698417
 US5705154
 US5750078
 US5770403
    - GIBBONS et al., Oncolmmunology, (20120000), vol. 1, no. 7, pages 1061 - 1073
    - GRIVENNIKOV et al., Cell, (20100000), vol. 140, pages 883 - 899
    - JONES et al., Nature, (19860000), vol. 321, pages 522 - 525
    - RIECHMANN et al., Nature, (19880000), vol. 332, pages 323 - 329
    - PRESTA, Curr. Op. Struct. Biol., (19920000), vol. 2, pages 593 - 596
    - MORRISON et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19840000), vol. 81, pages 6851 - 6855
    - HOLLINGE et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19930000), vol. 90, pages 6444 - 6448
    - The Pharmacology of Monoclonal Antibodies, Springer Verlag, (19940000), vol. 113, pages 269 - 315
    - MUYLDERMANS et al., Rev. Mol. Biotechnol., (20010000), vol. 74, pages 277 - 302
    - HOLT et al., Trends Biotechnol., (20030000), vol. 21, pages 484 - 90
    - KONIECZNY et al., Haematologia (Budap.), (19810000), vol. 14, page 95
    - MORRISON et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19840000), vol. 81, page 6851
    - JONES et al., Nature, (19860000), vol. 321, page 522
    - RIECHMANN et al., Nature, (19880000), vol. 332, page 323
    - BALDRICK, Regul. Toxicol. Pharmacol., (20000000), vol. 32, pages 210 - 218
    - WANG, Int. J. Pharm., (20000000), vol. 203, pages 1 - 60
    - CHARMAN, J. Pharm. Sci., (20000000), vol. 89, pages 967 - 978
    - POWELL et al., PDA J. Pharm. Sci. Technol., (19980000), vol. 52, pages 238 - 311
    - DONG et al., Immunity, (20040000), vol. 20, pages 327 - 336
    - GERDES et al., J. Immunol., (19840000), vol. 133, pages 1710 - 1715
    - JAYARAMAN, J. Immunol. Methods, (20050000), vol. 306, pages 68 - 79
    - HIRANO et al., Cancer Res., (20050000), vol. 65, pages 1089 - 1096
    - PARK et al., Blood, (20100000), vol. 116, pages 1291 - 1298
    - ALLIE et al., J. Immunol., (20110000), vol. 186, pages 6280 - 6286
    - QI et al., J. Biol. Chem., (20060000), vol. 281, pages 813 - 823
    - SARBASSOV et al., Science, (20050000), vol. 307, pages 1098 - 1101
    - JACINTO et al., Cell, (20060000), vol. 127, pages 125 - 137