blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP3473291 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201180029526 CN201380073657 CN201510079782 CN201580022407 CN201680037291 CN201811326836 EP11781384 EP13876666 EP15785819 EP16797047

More

EP18210204 EP19159361 EP19170875



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
WO2016187063Global Dossier 24.11.2016A1
Priority number Date
US201562162580 15.05.2015
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
WO2015168655Global Dossier 07.01.2016A3
WO2015168655 05.11.2015A2
Priority number Date
US201461988114 02.05.2014
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
WO2014133617Global Dossier 04.09.2014A1
Priority number Date
US201361771703 01.03.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2018229004Global Dossier 16.08.2018A1
Priority number Date
US37205010 09.08.2010
US201461988114 02.05.2014
US201361771703 01.03.2013
US34500510 14.05.2010
US201514702580 01.05.2015
US201815951954 12.04.2018
US201113107781 13.05.2011
US201314099050 06.12.2013
US34502210 14.05.2010
US38584410 23.09.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2018229003Global Dossier 16.08.2018A1
Priority number Date
US37205010 09.08.2010
US201815951931 12.04.2018
US201461988114 02.05.2014
US201361771703 01.03.2013
US34500510 14.05.2010
US201514702580 01.05.2015
US201113107781 13.05.2011
US201314099050 06.12.2013
US34502210 14.05.2010
US38584410 23.09.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2018133437Global Dossier 17.05.2018A1
Priority number Date
US37205010 09.08.2010
US201361771703 01.03.2013
US34500510 14.05.2010
US201113107781 13.05.2011
US201314099050 06.12.2013
US34502210 14.05.2010
US38584410 23.09.2010
US201815869872 12.01.2018
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2018028780Global Dossier 01.02.2018A1
Priority number Date
US37205010 09.08.2010
US201461988114 02.05.2014
US201361771703 01.03.2013
US34500510 14.05.2010
US201514702580 01.05.2015
US201715727528 06.10.2017
US201113107781 13.05.2011
US201314099050 06.12.2013
US34502210 14.05.2010
US38584410 23.09.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US10426931Global Dossier 01.10.2019B2
US2015119806 30.04.2015A1
Priority number Date
US37205010 09.08.2010
US201414585800 30.12.2014
US34500510 14.05.2010
US201113107781 13.05.2011
US34502210 14.05.2010
US41524810 18.11.2010
US38584410 23.09.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US10384039Global Dossier 20.08.2019B2
US2016256667 08.09.2016A1
Priority number Date
US37205010 09.08.2010
US201562162580 15.05.2015
US201461988114 02.05.2014
US201361771703 01.03.2013
US34500510 14.05.2010
US201514702580 01.05.2015
US201113107781 13.05.2011
US201314099050 06.12.2013
US34502210 14.05.2010
US38584410 23.09.2010
US201615154808 13.05.2016
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9950139Global Dossier 24.04.2018B2
US2015231364 20.08.2015A1
Priority number Date
US37205010 09.08.2010
US201461988114 02.05.2014
US201361771703 01.03.2013
US34500510 14.05.2010
US201514702580 01.05.2015
US201113107781 13.05.2011
US201314099050 06.12.2013
US34502210 14.05.2010
US38584410 23.09.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9872971Global Dossier 23.01.2018B2
US2014094774 03.04.2014A1
Priority number Date
US37205010 09.08.2010
US201361771703 01.03.2013
US34500510 14.05.2010
US201113107781 13.05.2011
US201314099050 06.12.2013
US34502210 14.05.2010
US38584410 23.09.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US8998852Global Dossier 07.04.2015B2
US2014031752 30.01.2014A1
Priority number Date
US37205010 09.08.2010
US201314044623 02.10.2013
US34500510 14.05.2010
US201113107781 13.05.2011
US34502210 14.05.2010
US41524810 18.11.2010
US38584410 23.09.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US8932258Global Dossier 13.01.2015B2
US2011282285 17.11.2011A1
Priority number Date
US37205010 09.08.2010
US34500510 14.05.2010
US201113107781 13.05.2011
US34502210 14.05.2010
US41524810 18.11.2010
US38584410 23.09.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
KR20180008531Global Dossier 24.01.2018A
Priority number Date
WO2016US32534 13.05.2016
US201562162580 15.05.2015
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP2018519015Global Dossier 19.07.2018A
Priority number Date
WO2016US32534 13.05.2016
US201562162580 15.05.2015
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP2017514579Global Dossier 08.06.2017A
Priority number Date
US201461988114 02.05.2014
WO2015US28950 01.05.2015
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP6469594BGlobal Dossier 13.02.2019B2
JP2016512050 25.04.2016A
Priority number Date
US201361771703 01.03.2013
WO2013US73577 06.12.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP6243735BGlobal Dossier 06.12.2017B2
JP2013529111 18.07.2013A
Priority number Date
US37205010 09.08.2010
US34500510 14.05.2010
US34502210 14.05.2010
US41524810 18.11.2010
WO2011US36530 13.05.2011
US38584410 23.09.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP3542847Global Dossier 25.09.2019A1
Priority number Date
US201361771703 01.03.2013
WO2013US73577 06.12.2013
EP13876666 06.12.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP3511039Global Dossier 17.07.2019A1
Priority number Date
US201461988114 02.05.2014
EP15785819 01.05.2015
WO2015US28950 01.05.2015
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP3294381Global Dossier 13.02.2019A4
EP3294381 21.03.2018A1
Priority number Date
WO2016US32534 13.05.2016
US201562162580 15.05.2015
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP3137130Global Dossier 28.08.2019B1
EP3137130 10.01.2018A4
EP3137130 08.03.2017A2
Priority number Date
US201461988114 02.05.2014
WO2015US28950 01.05.2015
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2961460Global Dossier 10.07.2019B1
EP2961460 26.10.2016A4
EP2961460 06.01.2016A1
Priority number Date
US201361771703 01.03.2013
WO2013US73577 06.12.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2569046Global Dossier 05.12.2018B1
EP2569046 06.12.2017A4
EP2569046 20.03.2013A1
Priority number Date
US37205010 09.08.2010
US34500510 14.05.2010
US34502210 14.05.2010
US41524810 18.11.2010
WO2011US36530 13.05.2011
US38584410 23.09.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN109200434Global Dossier 15.01.2019A
Priority number Date
US201361771703 01.03.2013
CN201380073657 06.12.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN107735123Global Dossier 23.02.2018A
Priority number Date
WO2016US32534 13.05.2016
US201562162580 15.05.2015
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN106456879Global Dossier 22.02.2017A
Priority number Date
US201461988114 02.05.2014
WO2015US28950 01.05.2015
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN105073174BGlobal Dossier 04.12.2018B
CN105073174 18.11.2015A
Priority number Date
US201361771703 01.03.2013
WO2013US73577 06.12.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN104689456BGlobal Dossier 13.07.2018B
CN104689456 10.06.2015A
Priority number Date
US37205010 09.08.2010
US34500510 14.05.2010
US34502210 14.05.2010
US41524810 18.11.2010
US38584410 23.09.2010
CN201180029526 13.05.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN102939129BGlobal Dossier 25.03.2015B
CN102939129 20.02.2013A
Priority number Date
US37205010 09.08.2010
US34500510 14.05.2010
US34502210 14.05.2010
US41524810 18.11.2010
WO2011US36530 13.05.2011
US38584410 23.09.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2985346Global Dossier 24.11.2016A1
Priority number Date
WO2016US32534 13.05.2016
US201562162580 15.05.2015
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2799360Global Dossier 20.11.2018C
CA2799360 17.11.2011A1
Priority number Date
US37205010 09.08.2010
US34500510 14.05.2010
US34502210 14.05.2010
US41524810 18.11.2010
WO2011US36530 13.05.2011
US38584410 23.09.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP3473291Global Dossier 24.04.2019A1
Priority number Date
US37205010 09.08.2010
EP11781384 13.05.2011
US34500510 14.05.2010
US34502210 14.05.2010
US41524810 18.11.2010
WO2011US36530 13.05.2011
US38584410 23.09.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2016265702 14.12.2017A1
Priority number Date
WO2016US32534 13.05.2016
US201562162580 15.05.2015
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
BR112012029024 02.08.2016A2
Priority number Date
US37205010 09.08.2010
US34500510 14.05.2010
US34502210 14.05.2010
US41524810 18.11.2010
WO2011US36530 13.05.2011
US38584410 23.09.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
BR112015021251 18.07.2017A2
Priority number Date
US201361771703 01.03.2013
WO2013US73577 06.12.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
BR112016024959 15.08.2017A2
Priority number Date
US201461988114 02.05.2014
WO2015US28950 01.05.2015
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
BR112017024621 31.07.2018A2
Priority number Date
WO2016US32534 13.05.2016
US201562162580 15.05.2015
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
ES2714249T 27.05.2019T3
Priority number Date
US37205010 09.08.2010
US34500510 14.05.2010
US34502210 14.05.2010
US41524810 18.11.2010
WO2011US36530 13.05.2011
US38584410 23.09.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
IL255634D 31.01.2018D0
Priority number Date
WO2016US32534 13.05.2016
US201562162580 15.05.2015
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
MX341401 18.08.2016B
MX2012013110 05.03.2013A
Priority number Date
US37205010 09.08.2010
US34500510 14.05.2010
US34502210 14.05.2010
US41524810 18.11.2010
WO2011US36530 13.05.2011
US38584410 23.09.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
MX2017014618 23.03.2018A
Priority number Date
WO2016US32534 13.05.2016
US201562162580 15.05.2015
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
RU2017141812 17.06.2019A
Priority number Date
WO2016US32534 13.05.2016
US201562162580 15.05.2015
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
USD733289S 30.06.2015S
Priority number Date
US37205010 09.08.2010
US34500510 14.05.2010
US201113107781 13.05.2011
US34502210 14.05.2010
US201229431403 06.09.2012
US41524810 18.11.2010
US38584410 23.09.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
USD735321S 28.07.2015S
Priority number Date
US37205010 09.08.2010
US34500510 14.05.2010
US201113107781 13.05.2011
US34502210 14.05.2010
US41524810 18.11.2010
US201229431405 06.09.2012
US38584410 23.09.2010
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2011143621Global Dossier 17.11.2011A1
Priority number Date
US37205010 09.08.2010
US34500510 14.05.2010
US34502210 14.05.2010
US41524810 18.11.2010
US38584410 23.09.2010
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
JP2018118079Global Dossier 02.08.2018A
Priority number Date
US37205010 09.08.2010
US34500510 14.05.2010
US34502210 14.05.2010
US41524810 18.11.2010
US38584410 23.09.2010
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
JP2016193207Global Dossier 17.11.2016A
Priority number Date
US37205010 09.08.2010
US34500510 14.05.2010
US34502210 14.05.2010
US41524810 18.11.2010
US38584410 23.09.2010
TypeType Earlier application
 EP2569046