Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3473291

EP3473291 - CATHETER PLACEMENT DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip24.05.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
C.R. Bard Inc.
730 Central Avenue
Murray Hill, NJ 07974 / US
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / BLANCHARD, Daniel B.
4507 Summerwood Drive
Bountiful, Utah 84010 / US
02 / HALL, John W.
981 South Parkway Drive
Utah 84054 / US
03 / STATS, Jason R.
1752 West 250 North
Layton, UT 84010 / US
04 / CHRISTENSEN, Mark A.
1230 East First South
Salt Lake City, UT 84010 / US
 [2019/23]
Former [2019/17]01 / BLANCHARD, Daniel B.
4507 Summerwood Drive
Bountiful, Utah 84010 / US
02 / HALL, John W.
981 South Parkway Drive
Utah 84054 / US
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date18210204.613.05.2011
[2019/17]
Priority number, dateUS201034500510P14.05.2010         Original published format: US 34500510 P
US201034502210P14.05.2010         Original published format: US 34502210 P
US201037205010P09.08.2010         Original published format: US 37205010 P
US201038584410P23.09.2010         Original published format: US 38584410 P
US201041524810P18.11.2010         Original published format: US 41524810 P
[2019/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3473291
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.03.2019
ClassificationInternational:A61M25/06, A61M31/00, A61M25/01, A61M25/09, A61M25/00, A61M5/32
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
TitleGerman:KATHETERPLATZIERUNGSVORRICHTUNG[2019/17]
English:CATHETER PLACEMENT DEVICE[2019/17]
French:DISPOSITIF DE PLACEMENT DE CATHÉTER[2019/17]
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
04.12.2018Examination requested  [2019/17]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP11781384.0  / EP2569046
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
04.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
04.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
04.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
04.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
04.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 08
21.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 09
Documents cited:Search[XI]EP2150304  (VASCULAR PATHWAYS INC [US]) [X] 1,2,5,6,8,12 * paragraph [0075] - paragraph [0077]; figure 1 * * figures 9-12, 19, 23A-27 * * figures 37A, 44A-44D * [I] 3,4,7,9;
 [A]US2008300574  (BELSON AMIR [US] ET AL) [A] 1 * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0023]; figures 1,3 * * paragraph [0030] *;
 [A]US5019049  (HAINING MICHAEL L [US]) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]US2007244438  (PEREZ JAMES GERARD [US]) [A] 1,7 * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0060]; figures 1C, 4 *;
 [A]US3592192  (HARAUTUNEIAN ANDREW) [A] 1 * column 1, line 5 - line 47; figures 1,2,8-12 *
by applicantUS6595955
 US6796962
 US6902546
 US7179244
 US7611485
 US7618395