Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3474546

EP3474546 - SCALABLE VIDEO CODING USING INTER-LAYER PREDICTION OF SPATIAL INTRA PREDICTION PARAMETERS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been published
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 14.09.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip31.05.2019Publication of search reportpublished on 03.07.2019  [2019/27]
31.05.2019Change - classificationpublished on 03.07.2019  [2019/27]
31.05.2019Change - classificationpublished on 03.07.2019  [2019/27]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GE Video Compression, LLC
8 Southwoods Boulevard
Albany, NY 12211 / US
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / HINZ, Tobias
Gartenstraße 16
16244 Schorfheide / DE
02 / LAKSHMAN, Haricharan
c/o Maier
Liegnitzer Straße 5
49610 Quakenbrück / DE
03 / STEGEMANN, Jan
Simplonstraße 55
10245 Berlin / DE
04 / HELLE, Philipp
Ahrenshooper Zeile 4
14129 Berlin / DE
05 / SIEKMANN, Mischa
Rodenbergstraße 23
10439 Berlin / DE
06 / SÜHRING, Karsten
Schreinerstraße 64A
10247 Berlin / DE
07 / MARPE, Detlev
Fünf Morgen 12A/B
14195 Berlin / DE
08 / SCHWARZ, Heiko
Bebelstraße 24
16341 Panketal / DE
09 / BARTNIK, Christian
Hauptstraße 5H
10317 Berlin / DE
10 / KHAIRAT ABDELHAMID, Ali Atef Ibrahim
Kreillerstraße 38
81673 München / DE
11 / KIRCHHOFFER, Heiner
Gotzkowskystraße 5
10555 Berlin / DE
12 / WIEGAND, Thomas
Otto-Appel-Straße 52
14195 Berlin / DE
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Zimmermann, Tankred Klaus , et al
Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler
Zinkler, Schenk & Partner mbB
Patentanwälte
Radlkoferstrasse 2
81373 München / DE
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date18210240.001.10.2013
[2019/17]
Priority number, dateUS201261708201P01.10.2012         Original published format: US 201261708201 P
[2019/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP3474546
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/17]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP3474546
Date:03.07.2019
Language:EN
[2019/27]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.06.2019
ClassificationInternational:H04N19/105, H04N19/119, H04N19/117, H04N19/157, H04N19/187, H04N19/82, H04N19/33, // H04N19/11, H04N19/463
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
TitleGerman:SKALIERBARE VIDEOCODIERUNG ÜBER EINE ZWISCHENSCHICHTVORAUSSAGE RÄUMLICHER INTRAPRÄDIKTIONSPARAMETER[2019/17]
English:SCALABLE VIDEO CODING USING INTER-LAYER PREDICTION OF SPATIAL INTRA PREDICTION PARAMETERS[2019/17]
French:CODAGE VIDÉO ÉCHELONNABLE UTILISANT LA PRÉDICTION INTER-COUCHE DE PARAMÈTRES D'INTRAPRÉDICTION SPATIALE[2019/17]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP13773692.2  / EP2904786
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
04.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
04.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
04.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[Y]EP1972146  (QUALCOMM INC [US]) [Y] 12 * paragraph [0083]; figure 10 *
 [Y]  - HONG D ET AL, "Scalability Support in HEVC", 6. JCT-VC MEETING; 97. MPEG MEETING; 14-7-2011 - 22-7-2011; TORINO; (JOINT COLLABORATIVE TEAM ON VIDEO CODING OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG.16 ); URL: HTTP://WFTP3.ITU.INT/AV-ARCH/JCTVC-SITE/,, (20110701), no. JCTVC-F290, XP030009313 [Y] 1-17 * paragraph [02.2]; figure 7a *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ISCAS.2012.6272185
 [XY]  - SCHWARZ H ET AL, "Overview of the Scalable Extension of the H.264/MPEG-4 AVC Video Coding Standard", 21. JVT MEETING; 78. MPEG MEETING; 20-10-2006 - 27-10-2006; HANGZHOU,CN; (JOINT VIDEO TEAM OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG.16 ),, (20061020), no. JVT-U145, XP030006791 [X] 17 * paragraph [III.B.1] * [Y] 1-17