Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3470494

EP3470494 - OLED COMPRISING ORGANIC COMPOUNDS CONTAINING B-N HETEROCYCLES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 20.09.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.09.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Universal Display Corporation
375 Ewing Blvd.
Ewing, New Jersey 08618 / US
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / LIN, Chun
c/o Universal Display Corporation
375 Phillips Boulevard
Ewing, NJ New Jersey 08618 / US
02 / XIA, Chuanjun
c/o Universal Display Corporation
375 Phillips Boulevard
Ewing, NJ New Jersey 08618 / US
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Hansen, Norbert
Maiwald Patentanwalts- und
Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH
Elisenhof
Elisenstraße 3
80335 München / DE
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date18210249.123.09.2013
[2019/16]
Priority number, dateUS201261704837P24.09.2012         Original published format: US 201261704837 P
US20131378651906.03.2013         Original published format: US201313786519
[2019/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3470494
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/16]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.03.2019
ClassificationInternational:C09K11/06, H05B33/10
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
TitleGerman:OLED MIT B-N-HETEROCYCLEN-HALTIGEN ORGANISCHEN VERBINDUNGEN[2019/16]
English:OLED COMPRISING ORGANIC COMPOUNDS CONTAINING B-N HETEROCYCLES[2019/16]
French:DELO COMPRENANT DES COMPOSÉS ORGANIQUES CONTENANT DES HÉTÉROCYCLES B-N[2019/16]
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
04.12.2018Examination requested  [2019/16]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP13185489.5  / EP2711408
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
04.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
04.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
04.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
13.09.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[A]DE102012000064  (MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [A]  - ERIC R. ABBEY ET AL, "Boron in Disguise: The Parent "Fused" BN Indole", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, (20110803), vol. 133, no. 30, doi:10.1021/ja205779b, ISSN 0002-7863, pages 11508 - 11511, XP055085707 [A] 1-15 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja205779b
 [A]  - ERIC R. ABBEY ET AL, "Electrophilic Aromatic Substitution of a BN Indole", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, (20101124), vol. 132, no. 46, doi:10.1021/ja107312u, ISSN 0002-7863, pages 16340 - 16342, XP055085675 [A] 1-15 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja107312u
 [A]  - ARTHUR J ASHE ET AL, "A Synthesis of Aromatic Five- and Six-Membered B-N Heterocycles via Ring Closing Metathesis", ORGANIC LETTERS, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, US, vol. 2, no. 14, doi:10.1021/OL0001113, ISSN 1523-7060, (20000101), pages 2089 - 2091, (20000617), XP007913678 [A] 1-15 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ol0001113
 [A]  - WEBER ET AL, "Recent developments in the chemistry of 1,3,2-diazaborolines-(2,3-dihydro-1H-1,3,2-diazaboroles)", COORDINATION CHEMISTRY REVIEWS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20071211), vol. 252, no. 1-2, ISSN 0010-8545, pages 1 - 31, XP022385258 [A] 1-15 * the whole document *
by applicantUS5844363
 US6303238
 US5707745
 US7279704
 US4769292
 US2003230980
 US5703436
 US6097147
 US2004174116
 US5247190
 US6091195
 US5834893
 US6013982
 US6087196
 US6337102
 US6294398
 US6468819
 US7968146
    - BALDO et al., "Highly Efficient Phosphorescent Emission from Organic Electroluminescent Devices", Nature, (19980000), vol. 395, doi:doi:10.1038/25954, pages 151 - 154, XP001002103

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/25954
    - BALDO et al., "Very high-efficiency green organic light-emitting devices based on electrophosphorescence", Appl. Phys. Lett., (19990000), vol. 75, no. 3, doi:doi:10.1063/1.124258, pages 4 - 6, XP012023409

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.124258
    - LIU et al., Ang. Chem. Int., (20120000), vol. 51, pages 6074 - 6092
    - ABBEY et al., J. Am. Chem. Soc., (20110000), vol. 133, pages 11508 - 11511
 US20050233470
 WO2007US23098
 WO2009US42829