Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3474153

EP3474153 - GENERATING CARD STACKS WITH QUERIES ON ONLINE SOCIAL NETWORKS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  25.10.2019
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip01.11.2019Change - representative 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Facebook, Inc.
1601 Willow Road
Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / GARG, Avichal
c/o Facebook, Inc.
1601 Willow Road
Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US
02 / HUA, Ming
c/o Facebook, Inc.
1601 Willow Road
Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US
03 / VERNAL, Michael
c/o Facebook, Inc.
1601 Willow Road
Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US
04 / QIN, Yang
c/o Facebook, Inc.
1601 Willow Road
Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US
05 / FECHETE, Dan Ionut
c/o Facebook, Inc.
1601 Willow Road
Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US
06 / XIAO, Xinpan
c/o Facebook, Inc.
1601 Willow Road
Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US
07 / HUANG, Yu
c/o Facebook, Inc.
1601 Willow Road
Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US
08 / CHEN, Lu D.
c/o Facebook, Inc.
1601 Willow Road
Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US
09 / CHAKRADEO, Saurabh Prafulla
c/o Facebook, Inc.
1601 Willow Road
Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US
10 / BHATT, Dharmesh A.
c/o Facebook, Inc.
1601 Willow Road
Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US
11 / HIMEL, Alex
c/o Facebook, Inc.
1601 Willow Road
Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Murgitroyd & Company
Murgitroyd House
165-169 Scotland Street
Glasgow G5 8PL / GB
[N/P]
Former [2019/17]Schröer, Gernot H.
Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte
Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Bankgasse 3
90402 Nürnberg / DE
Application number, filing date18210378.809.07.2014
[2019/17]
Priority number, dateUS201361918431P19.12.2013         Original published format: US 201361918431 P
US20141425882122.04.2014         Original published format: US201414258821
WO2014US3513523.04.2014         Original published format: PCT/US2014/035135
[2019/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3474153
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.03.2019
ClassificationInternational:G06F16/00
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/48]
Former [2019/17]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:ERZEUGUNG VON KARTENSTAPELN MIT ANFRAGEN AUF SOZIALEN ONLINE-NETZWERKEN[2019/17]
English:GENERATING CARD STACKS WITH QUERIES ON ONLINE SOCIAL NETWORKS[2019/17]
French:GÉNÉRATION DE PILES DE CARTE AVEC DES INTERROGATIONS SUR DES RÉSEAUX SOCIAUX EN LIGNE[2019/17]
Examination procedure23.10.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
23.10.2019Examination requested  [2019/48]
23.10.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP14176343.3  / EP2887237
EP17169010.0  / EP3232344
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
05.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
05.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
26.07.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[Y]US2013124542  (LEE YOFAY KARI [US] ET AL) [Y] 1-15 * claim 1 * * figures 5, 6E, 6B, 7, 8 * * page 1 - page 2 * * page 7, paragraph 0047 - page 12, paragraph 0065 *;
 [Y]US2012290950  (RAPAPORT JEFFREY ALAN [PH] ET AL) [Y] 1-15 * figure 1 *
by applicantUS20100763162
 US20060503093
 US20100977027
 US20100978265