Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3470823

EP3470823 - METHOD FOR DETERMINING THE ABRASION RESISTANCE OF AT LEAST ONE WEAR LAYER ON A SUPPORT PLATE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  27.09.2019
Database last updated on 18.11.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  11.07.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip27.09.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 30.10.2019  [2019/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Flooring Technologies Ltd.
SmartCity Malta SCM01
Office 406
Ricasoli
Kalkara SCM1001 / MT
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / KALWA, Norbert Dr.
Birkenweg 18a
32805 Horn-Bad Meinberg / DE
02 / DENK, Andre
Beethovenstraße 5
16909 Wittstock/Dosse / DE
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Maikowski & Ninnemann Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Postfach 15 09 20
10671 Berlin / DE
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date18210396.021.03.2016
[2019/16]
Priority number, dateEP2015016296909.04.2015         Original published format: EP 15162969
WO2015EP7777526.11.2015         Original published format: PCT/EP2015/077775
[2019/16]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3470823
Date:17.04.2019
Language:DE
[2019/16]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3470823
Date:30.10.2019
Language:DE
[2019/44]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.01.2019
ClassificationInternational:G01N21/359, // G01N3/56
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR BESTIMMUNG DER ABRIEBFESTIGKEIT VON MINDESTENS EINER AUF EINER TRÄGERPLATTE ANGEORDNETEN VERSCHLEISSSCHICHT[2019/16]
English:METHOD FOR DETERMINING THE ABRASION RESISTANCE OF AT LEAST ONE WEAR LAYER ON A SUPPORT PLATE[2019/16]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTERMINATION DE LA RÉSISTANCE À LA FRICTION D'AU MOINS UNE COUCHE D'USURE DISPOSÉE SUR UNE PLAQUE DE SUPPORT[2019/16]
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
05.12.2018Examination requested  [2019/16]
25.02.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
11.07.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.09.2019Fee for grant paid
19.09.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
19.09.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP16711601.1  / EP3280998
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
27.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[A]EP2808636  (FLOORING TECHNOLOGIES LTD [MT]) [A] 1-14 * paragraph [0067] - paragraph [0068] *;
 [A]DE102009037541  (SAECHSISCHES INST FUER DIE DRUCKINDUSTRIE GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-14 * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0028] * * paragraph [0036] * * paragraph [0039] *;
 [AP]EP2915658  (FLOORING TECHNOLOGIES LTD [MT]) [AP] 1-14 * paragraph [0064] * * paragraph [0042] *
by applicantEP2338693