Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP3470823 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3470823



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 230
11.11.2019 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
04.10.2019 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
19.09.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
19.09.2019 English translation of the claims Search / examination 3
19.09.2019 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
19.09.2019 French translation of claims Search / examination 4
19.09.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
11.07.2019 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
11.07.2019 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
11.07.2019 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
11.07.2019 Text intended for grant Search / examination 32
11.07.2019 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 32
11.06.2019 Examination started Search / examination 1
29.05.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
29.05.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
29.05.2019 Maintenance of the application Search / examination 2
24.04.2019 Invitation to confirm maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 2
20.03.2019 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
25.02.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
25.02.2019 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
25.02.2019 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
25.02.2019 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 2
25.02.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
22.02.2019 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
15.02.2019 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
23.01.2019 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
17.01.2019 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
17.01.2019 European search opinion Search / examination 4
17.01.2019 European search report Search / examination 2
17.01.2019 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
05.12.2018 Abstract Search / examination 1
05.12.2018 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
05.12.2018 Claims Search / examination 3
05.12.2018 Description Search / examination 23
05.12.2018 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
05.12.2018 Drawings Search / examination 5
05.12.2018 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5
09.11.2017 Priority search results copy provided by EPO Search / examination 12
09.11.2017 Priority search results copy provided by EPO Search / examination 4
31.10.2016 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 29
31.10.2016 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 26