Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP3470823


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
27.09.2019 (Expected) grant published on  30.10.2019  [2019/44]
23.09.2019 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
23.09.2019 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
20.09.2019 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
11.07.2019 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
28.06.2019 Change - classification published on  31.07.2019  [2019/31]
14.06.2019 Change - classification published on  17.07.2019  [2019/29]
10.04.2019 Deletion - The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established
10.04.2019 Request for examination filed published on  17.04.2019  [2019/16]
30.03.2019 New entry: Renewal fee paid
15.03.2019 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  17.04.2019  [2019/16]
15.03.2019 The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established
15.03.2019 Request for examination filed published on  17.04.2019  [2019/16]
26.02.2019 Amendment by applicant
08.12.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
06.12.2018 Change - representative