blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3494929

EP3494929 - LOW PROFILE DELIVERY SYSTEM FOR TRANSCATHETER HEART VALVE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  15.11.2019
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  23.10.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  28.05.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  10.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip24.05.2024Change: Appeal number 
24.05.2024Deletion: Date of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Edwards Lifesciences Corporation
One Edwards Way
Irvine, CA 92614 / US
[2019/24]
Inventor(s)01 / LE, Thanh H.
Edwards Lifesciences
One Edwards Way
Irvine, CA 92614 / US
02 / TRAN, Tri
Edwards Lifesciences
One Edwards Way
Irvine, CA 92614 / US
03 / CAYABYAB, Ronaldo
Edwards Lifesciences
One Edwards Way
Irvine, CA 92614 / US
04 / TAYLOR, David
Edwards Lifesciences
One Edwards Way
Irvine, CA 92614 / US
05 / VIDAL, Antonio
Edwards Lifesciences
One Edwards Way
Irvine, CA 92614 / US
06 / BOWES, Bobert
Edwards Lifesciences
One Edwards Way
Irvine, CA 92614 / US
 [2019/24]
Representative(s)Thum, Bernhard, et al
Thum & Partner
Thum Mötsch Weickert
Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Siebertstr. 6
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2019/24]Eisenführ Speiser
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB
Postfach 31 02 60
80102 München / DE
Application number, filing date18210923.101.05.2009
[2019/24]
Priority number, dateUS20085200908P09.05.2008         Original published format: US 5200908 P
US20088311708P23.07.2008         Original published format: US 8311708 P
US20082478460808.10.2008         Original published format: US 24784608
[2019/24]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3494929
Date:12.06.2019
Language:EN
[2019/24]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3494929
Date:18.12.2019
Language:EN
[2019/51]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.05.2019
ClassificationIPC:A61F2/24, A61F2/95
[2019/24]
CPC:
A61F2/2433 (EP,US); A61F2/9517 (EP,US); A61M25/01 (EP,US);
A61M25/0147 (EP,US); A61M25/10 (EP,US); A61M25/1011 (EP,US);
A61F2/2418 (EP,US); A61F2/2427 (US); A61F2/2436 (EP,US);
A61M2025/0681 (EP,US); A61M2025/1081 (EP,US); A61M2025/1093 (EP,US);
A61M25/0105 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2019/24]
TitleGerman:EINFÜHRUNGSSYSTEM MIT FLACHEM PROFIL FÜR TRANSKATHETERHERZKLAPPE[2019/24]
English:LOW PROFILE DELIVERY SYSTEM FOR TRANSCATHETER HEART VALVE[2019/24]
French:SYSTÈME D'ADMINISTRATION À PROFIL BAS DE VALVULE CARDIAQUE PAR TRANSCATHÉTER[2019/24]
Examination procedure07.12.2018Examination requested  [2019/24]
13.05.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
03.06.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.07.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.10.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.11.2019Fee for grant paid
07.11.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
07.11.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP09743346.0  / EP2291145
Divisional application(s)EP19189544.0  / EP3590471
EP20194267.9  / EP3763333
EP20194277.8  / EP3769722
EP23205406.4  / EP4299040
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  21.08.2020  26.08.2020  ADMISSIBLE
Meril GmbH
Bornheimer Straße 135-137
53119 Bonn / DE
Opponent's representative
Marks & Clerk LLP, et al, et al
15 Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1BW / GB
 02  18.09.2020  22.09.2020  WITHDRAWN
MEDTRONIC INC.
710 Medtronic Parkway
Minneapolis, MN 55432 / US
Opponent's representative
Zimmermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Postfach 330 920
80069 München / DE
 [2023/50]
Former [2023/27]
Opponent(s)01  21.08.2020  26.08.2020  ADMISSIBLE
Meril GmbH
Bornheimer Straße 135-137
53119 Bonn / DE
Opponent's representative
Klicznik, Alexander, et al, et al
Hogan Lovells International LLP
Kennedydamm 24
40476 Düsseldorf / DE
 02  18.09.2020  22.09.2020  WITHDRAWN
MEDTRONIC INC.
710 Medtronic Parkway
Minneapolis, MN 55432 / US
Opponent's representative
Zimmermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Postfach 330 920
80069 München / DE
Former [2020/44]
Opponent(s)01  21.08.2020  26.08.2020  ADMISSIBLE
Meril GmbH
Bornheimer Straße 135-137
53119 Bonn / DE
Opponent's representative
Klicznik, Alexander, et al, et al
Hogan Lovells International LLP
Kennedydamm 24
40476 Düsseldorf / DE
 02  18.09.2020  22.09.2020  ADMISSIBLE
MEDTRONIC INC.
710 Medtronic Parkway
Minneapolis, MN 55432 / US
Opponent's representative
Zimmermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Postfach 330 920
80069 München / DE
Former [2020/40]
Opponent(s)01  21.08.2020  26.08.2020  ADMISSIBLE
Meril GmbH
Bornheimer Straße 135-137
53119 Bonn / DE
Opponent's representative
Klicznik, Alexander, et al, et al
Hogan Lovells International LLP
Kennedydamm 24
40476 Düsseldorf / DE
02.10.2020Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
12.02.2021Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
01.02.2022Date of oral proceedings
24.02.2022Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
24.02.2022Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition03.05.2022Appeal received No.  T1176/22
03.05.2022Payment of appeal fee
06.07.2022Statement of grounds filed
28.04.2022Appeal received No.  T1176/22
28.04.2022Payment of appeal fee
06.07.2022Statement of grounds filed
02.05.2022Appeal received No.  T1176/22
02.05.2022Payment of appeal fee
04.07.2022Statement of grounds filed
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
07.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
07.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
07.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
07.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
07.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 08
07.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 09
07.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 10
21.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 11
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY18.12.2019
MC18.12.2019
MK18.12.2019
MT18.12.2019
[2022/33]
Former [2022/28]CY18.12.2019
MC18.12.2019
MT18.12.2019
Former [2021/12]MC18.12.2019
Documents cited:SearchUS5030204  [ ] (BADGER RODNEY S [US], et al) [ ] * the whole document *;
 [X]US5769812  (STEVENS JOHN H [US], et al) [X] 1,6,9,10 * column 40, line 35 - column 41, line 60; figures 34a-35b *;
 [X]WO2006138173  (EDWARDS LIFESCIENCES CORP [US], et al) [X] 1,6,9,10 * paragraphs [0007] - [0012] - [0093] - [0100]; figures 1-23 *;
 [Y]US2007156225  (GEORGE ROBERT [US], et al) [Y] 2-5* paragraphs [0110] - [0131]; figures 10A-12H *;
 [XAY]WO2008031103  (EDWARDS LIFESCIENCES CORP [US], et al) [X] 1,6,9,10 * paragraphs [0002] - [0004] - [0008] , [0097] - [0104]; figures 15-18B * [A] 7,8,11-16 [Y] 2-5
by applicantUS6730118
 US2007005131
 US2008065011
OppositionUS5200908
 US5273535
 US5315996
 EP0787019
 WO2004039273
 US2008065011
 WO2009137359
 WO2005032639
 WO2007059252
 US2007156225
 WO2008031103
    - Anonymous, "Edwards Lifesciences Introduces New Transcatheter Valve Delivery System at EuroPCR 2008", EDWARDS LIFESCIENCES, (20080512), XP055733262
    - BAILEY, "Percutaneous Expandable Prosthetic Valves", BAILEY, TOPOL EJ, Textbook of Interventional Cardiology, (19940000), pages 1268 - 1272, XP055400524
    - CRIBIER, ALAIN, "The development of transcatheter aortic valve replacement (TAVR)", Global cardiology science & practice, (20161230), vol. 2016, no. 32, pages 1 - 15, XP055638259

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.21542/gcsp.2016.32
    - JOSEPHSON, MARK E., "Chapter 1", Clinical Cardiac Electrophysiology: Techniques and Interpretations, (20080400), pages 1 - 27, XP055733185
    - "FDA regulatory document of the CoreValve device and its delivery catheter system", Anonymous, pages 1 - 42, URL: https://www.accessdata.fda.gov/cdrh_docs/pdf13/P130021 b.pdf, XP055733197
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.