Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3473123

EP3473123 - SOLE ASSEMBLY FOR AN ARTICLE OF FOOTWEAR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  28.01.2020
Database last updated on 25.02.2020
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  11.10.2019
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.01.2020New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Wolverine Outdoors, Inc.
9341 Courtland Drive, NE
Rockford, MI 49351 / US
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / JESSIMAN, Alexander W.
23 Keefe Avenue, 1st Floor
Newton, MA 02464 / US
02 / WHITE, J. Spencer
11 Jenny Lind Street
North Easton, MA 02356 / US
03 / PAULSON, Andrea A.
48 Varnum Street
Arlington, MA 02474 / US
04 / MAHONEY, Christopher J.
27 Commerford Rd
Concord, MA 01742 / US
05 / O'MALLEY, Patrick G.
41 Walden Street
Newton, MA 02460 / US
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP
Lincoln House, 5th Floor
300 High Holborn
London WC1V 7JH / GB
[N/P]
Former [2019/17]Haseltine Lake LLP
Lincoln House, 5th Floor
300 High Holborn
London WC1V 7JH / GB
Application number, filing date18210977.715.04.2016
[2019/17]
Priority number, dateUS20151468930017.04.2015         Original published format: US201514689300
[2019/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3473123
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.03.2019
ClassificationInternational:A43B13/12, A43B13/18, A43B5/06
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/46]
Former [2019/17]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:SOHLENBAUGRUPPE FÜR EINEN SCHUHARTIKEL[2019/17]
English:SOLE ASSEMBLY FOR AN ARTICLE OF FOOTWEAR[2019/17]
French:ENSEMBLE DE SEMELLE POUR UN ARTICLE CHAUSSANT[2019/17]
Examination procedure04.10.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
04.10.2019Examination requested  [2019/46]
04.10.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
29.01.2020Communication of intention to grant the patent
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP16165610.3  / EP3081110
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
08.04.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[A]US2011162239  (BIER CHRISTIAN [DE], et al) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO2007104525  (HIDDE AXEL R [DE], et al) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *