Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3474521

EP3474521 - CROSS-STRATUM OPTIMIZATION PROTOCOL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 19.09.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip30.08.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang District
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / LEE, Young
Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian, Longgang District
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN
02 / XIA, Yangsong
Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian, Longgang District
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Epping - Hermann - Fischer
Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH
Schloßschmidstraße 5
80639 München / DE
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date18210990.026.08.2011
[2019/17]
Priority number, dateUS20111321680824.08.2011         Original published format: US201113216808
US201037735210P26.08.2010         Original published format: US 37735210 P
US201037736110P26.08.2010         Original published format: US 37736110 P
[2019/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3474521
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.03.2019
ClassificationInternational:H04L29/10, H04L29/08
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
TitleGerman:SCHICHTENÜBERGREIFENDES OPTIMIERUNGSPROTOKOLL[2019/17]
English:CROSS-STRATUM OPTIMIZATION PROTOCOL[2019/17]
French:PROTOCOLE D'OPTIMISATION À TRAVERS DES COUCHES[2019/17]
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
07.12.2018Examination requested  [2019/17]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP11819438.0  / EP2569922
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
07.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
07.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
07.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
07.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
07.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 08
27.08.2019Renewal fee patent year 09
Documents cited:Search[XI]WO0211459  (AEPONA LTD [GB]; MCQUILLAN LIAM [GB]; DALTON KIERAN [GB]) [X] 1-6,8,10,12,15 * figure 2 * * page 3, line 26 - page 4, line 7 * * page 6, line 16 - page 7, line 15 * * page 9, line 17 - line 21 * * page 16, line 1 - page 17, line 6 * [I] 7,9,11,13,14;
 [A]US2007249321  (KUMAR G V [IN] ET AL) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0038] *;
 [A]EP2079197  (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) [A] 1-15 * abstract *