Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3473115

EP3473115 - VAPORISABLE MATERIAL PLUG AND CAPSULE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been published
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 21.09.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip27.05.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
JT International SA
8, Rue Kazem Radjavi
1202 Geneva / CH
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / YILMAZ, Ugurhan
Im Wiesengrund 30
54329 Konz / DE
02 / SUZUKI, Toshifumi
Chemin du Connétable 6
1223 Cologny / CH
03 / JOHAENTGES, Thomas
Adolf-Kolping-Strasse 17
54338 Schweich / DE
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Gill Jennings & Every LLP
The Broadgate Tower
20 Primrose Street
London EC2A 2ES / GB
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date18211102.102.05.2014
[2019/17]
Priority number, dateEP2013016619802.05.2013         Original published format: EP 13166198
[2019/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3473115
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.03.2019
ClassificationInternational:A24D1/14, A24F47/00, A61M15/00
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
TitleGerman:VERSCHLUSS UND KAPSEL AUS VERDAMPFBAREM MATERIAL[2019/17]
English:VAPORISABLE MATERIAL PLUG AND CAPSULE[2019/17]
French:BOUCHON ET CAPSULE DE MATÉRIAU VAPORISABLE[2019/17]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP14725378.5  / EP2991512
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
07.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
07.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
23.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[XA]GB2473264  (BRITISH AMERICAN TOBACCO CO [GB]) [X] 1,4,10-13 * page 7, line 1 - page 11, line 15; figure 1 * [A] 6,14,15;
 [XAI]JP2006063100  (ENDO SHOZO) [X] 1,2,5,7 * abstract * [A] 6,8,9 [I] 3,4;
 [XAI]WO2007012007  (PLOOM [US], et al) [X] 10,11,13 * page 8 - page 9; figure 5 * [A] 14,15 [I] 12;
 [XA]GB2469850  (BRITISH AMERICAN TOBACCO CO [GB]) [X] 1,4,10-13 * page 3, line 7 - line 19; figure 3 * [A] 6,14,15;
 [AD]WO2009079641  (PLOOM INC [US], et al) [AD] 1-15 * the whole document *
by applicantWO2009079641