Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3474415

EP3474415 - WIRELESS POWER TRANSMISSION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 20.09.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.08.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ossia Inc.
16233 NE 112th Court
Redmond, WA 98052 / US
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / ZEINE, Hatem I.
16233 NE 112th Court
Redmond, WA 98052 / US
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)AWA Sweden AB
P.O. Box 5117
200 71 Malmö / SE
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date18211220.117.08.2011
[2019/17]
Priority number, dateUS20108615261023.08.2010         Original published format: US 86152610
[2019/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3474415
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP31.01.2019
ClassificationInternational:H02J7/00, H02J50/20, H02J50/27, H02J50/23, H02J7/02
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
TitleGerman:SYSTEM ZUR DRAHTLOSEN STROMÜBERTRAGUNG[2019/17]
English:WIRELESS POWER TRANSMISSION SYSTEM[2019/17]
French:SYSTÈME DE TRANSMISSION D'ÉNERGIE SANS FIL[2019/17]
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
10.12.2018Examination requested  [2019/17]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP11820399.1  / EP2609670
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
10.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
10.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
10.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
10.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
10.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 08
15.08.2019Renewal fee patent year 09
Documents cited:Search[X]US2008309452  (ZEINE HATEM [US]) [X] 1-18 * paragraphs [0003] , [0011] , [0013] , [0023] , [0024] , [0031]; figures 1-6 *;
 [E]US2016099755  (LEABMAN MICHAEL A [US], et al) [E] 1-18 * paragraphs [0143] - [0155]; figures 10A,B *