Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3473545

EP3473545 - SINGLE STAGE ENGINE BLEED [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  01.11.2019
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip01.11.2019The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established 
01.11.2019Request for examination filedpublished on 04.12.2019  [2019/49]
01.11.2019Change - designated statespublished on 04.12.2019  [2019/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hamilton Sundstrand Corporation
Four Coliseum Centre
2730 West Tyvola Road
Charlotte, NC 28217-4578 / US
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / RONAN, Michael
163 Shagbark Road
Glastonbury, CT 06033 / US
 [2019/30]
Former [2019/17]01 / RONAN, Michael
P.O. Box 06108
122 Cornell Circle
East Hartford, CT 06108 / US
Representative(s)Dehns
St. Bride's House
10 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8JD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2019/17]Dehns
St. Brides House
10 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8JD / GB
Application number, filing date18211422.318.06.2014
[2019/17]
Priority number, dateUS201361868408P21.08.2013         Original published format: US 201361868408 P
[2019/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3473545
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.02.2019
ClassificationInternational:B64D13/06, F02C9/18, F02C6/08, F02C7/32
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/49]
Former [2019/17]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:EINSTUFIGE MOTORENTLÜFTUNG[2019/17]
English:SINGLE STAGE ENGINE BLEED[2019/17]
French:PURGE DE MOTEUR À ÉTAGE UNIQUE[2019/17]
Examination procedure24.10.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
24.10.2019Examination requested  [2019/49]
24.10.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP14837464.8  / EP3036161
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
10.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
10.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
21.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[XYI]US6058715  (STRANG JAMES E [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6 * abstract * [Y] 5 [I] 5,7;
 [Y]US5956960  (NIGGEMAN RICHARD E [US]) [Y] 5 * abstract *;
 [A]US5967461  (FARRINGTON FRANKLIN D [US]) [A] 1-7 * columns 3-7; figures 1-7 *;
 [A]WO0123724  (ALLIED SIGNAL INC [US]) [A] 1-7 * pages 5-10; figures 1-2 *;
 [A]US2010314877  (FINNEY ADAM M [US]) [A] 1-7 * abstract *;
 [A]EP1283166  (HONEYWELL NORMALAIR GARRETT [GB]) [A] 1-7 * pages 2-3; figure 1 *;
 [XI]US2006231680  (DEROUINEAU JEAN-LUC [US], et al) [X] 1-6 * pages 1-5; figures 1-3 * [I] 7
by applicantUS6058715
 US5956960