Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3474524

EP3474524 - TECHNIQUES FOR BEHAVIORAL PAIRING IN A CONTACT CENTER SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been published
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 20.09.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip01.06.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Afiniti International Holdings, Ltd.
27th Floor
Millbank Tower 21-24
Millbank
London SW1P 4QP / GB
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / CHISHTI, Zia
910 15th Street NW
Washington DC, WA Washington 20005 / US
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Brunner, John Michael Owen
Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date18211624.413.05.2016
[2019/17]
Priority number, dateUS20151487165830.09.2015         Original published format: US201514871658
[2019/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3474524
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.03.2019
ClassificationInternational:H04M3/523
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR VERHALTENSPAARUNG IN EINEM KONTAKTCENTERSYSTEM[2019/17]
English:TECHNIQUES FOR BEHAVIORAL PAIRING IN A CONTACT CENTER SYSTEM[2019/17]
French:TECHNIQUES D'APPARIEMENT COMPORTEMENTAL DANS UN SYSTÈME DE CENTRE DE CONTACT[2019/17]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP16730466.6  / EP3186948
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
28.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[I]US2013251137  (CHISHTI ZIA [US], et al) [I] 1-12 * paragraphs [0079] - [0082] - [0085] *;
 [I]WO2010053701  (RESOURCE GROUP INTERNAT LTD, et al) [I] 1-12 * paragraphs [0010] - [0012] *;
 [I]WO2009097210  (RESOURCE GROUP INTERNATIONAL L, et al) [I] 1-12 * abstract *;
 [I]US2013051545  (ROSS ERIK STEPHEN [US], et al) [I] 1-12 * the whole document *
by applicantUS7798876