blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3498450

EP3498450 - IMPROVED EXTRUDER SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  07.10.2022
Database last updated on 18.05.2024
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  29.10.2021
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  24.06.2021
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  27.12.2019
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  17.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip03.05.2024Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company
200 Innovation Way
Akron, OH 44316 / US
[2019/25]
Inventor(s)01 / CHEN, Hongbing
4415 Karen Lynn Drive
Broadview Heights, OH 44147 / US
02 / DYRLUND, Christopher David
5239 Violet Knoll Avenue NE
Canton, OH 44705 / US
03 / PHILLIPSON, Joshua Aaron
10042 Gatewood Drive
Brecksville, OH 44141 / US
04 / VANASDALE, Jared
6704 Trenton Road
Boardman, OH 44512 / US
 [2019/25]
Representative(s)Kutsch, Bernd
Goodyear S.A.
Patent Department
Avenue Gordon Smith
7750 Colmar-Berg / LU
[2019/25]
Application number, filing date18212007.112.12.2018
[2019/25]
Priority number, dateUS20171584487518.12.2017         Original published format: US201715844875
[2019/25]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3498450
Date:19.06.2019
Language:EN
[2019/25]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3498450
Date:01.12.2021
Language:EN
[2021/48]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.05.2019
ClassificationIPC:B29C48/72, B29C48/50, B29C48/395, B29C48/285, B29C48/685
[2019/25]
CPC:
B29B7/60 (EP); B29C48/285 (CN); B29C48/2567 (US);
B29B7/42 (EP); B29B7/7495 (EP); B29C48/265 (US);
B29C48/2888 (EP,US); B29C48/397 (EP,CN,US); B29C48/501 (EP,US);
B29C48/505 (CN); B29C48/64 (CN); B29C48/655 (US);
B29C48/68 (CN,US); B29C48/686 (EP,US); B29C48/725 (EP,US);
B29C2948/92514 (EP,US); B29C2948/92876 (EP,US); B29C48/92 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2020/05]
Former [2019/25]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:VERBESSERTES EXTRUDERSYSTEM[2019/25]
English:IMPROVED EXTRUDER SYSTEM[2019/25]
French:SYSTÈME D'EXTRUDEUSE AMÉLIORÉ[2019/25]
Examination procedure12.12.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
19.12.2019Examination requested  [2020/05]
19.12.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
25.06.2021Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.10.2021Fee for grant paid
22.10.2021Fee for publishing/printing paid
22.10.2021Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)02.09.2022No opposition filed within time limit [2022/45]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.12.2020Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU12.12.2018
AL01.12.2021
AT01.12.2021
CY01.12.2021
CZ01.12.2021
DK01.12.2021
EE01.12.2021
ES01.12.2021
FI01.12.2021
HR01.12.2021
LT01.12.2021
LV01.12.2021
MC01.12.2021
MK01.12.2021
NL01.12.2021
PL01.12.2021
RO01.12.2021
RS01.12.2021
SE01.12.2021
SI01.12.2021
SK01.12.2021
SM01.12.2021
IE12.12.2021
LU12.12.2021
BE31.12.2021
CH31.12.2021
LI31.12.2021
BG01.03.2022
NO01.03.2022
GR02.03.2022
IS01.04.2022
PT01.04.2022
[2024/23]
Former [2023/33]HU12.12.2018
AL01.12.2021
AT01.12.2021
CY01.12.2021
CZ01.12.2021
DK01.12.2021
EE01.12.2021
ES01.12.2021
FI01.12.2021
HR01.12.2021
LT01.12.2021
LV01.12.2021
MC01.12.2021
NL01.12.2021
PL01.12.2021
RO01.12.2021
RS01.12.2021
SE01.12.2021
SI01.12.2021
SK01.12.2021
SM01.12.2021
IE12.12.2021
LU12.12.2021
BE31.12.2021
CH31.12.2021
LI31.12.2021
BG01.03.2022
NO01.03.2022
GR02.03.2022
IS01.04.2022
PT01.04.2022
Former [2023/30]AL01.12.2021
AT01.12.2021
CY01.12.2021
CZ01.12.2021
DK01.12.2021
EE01.12.2021
ES01.12.2021
FI01.12.2021
HR01.12.2021
LT01.12.2021
LV01.12.2021
MC01.12.2021
NL01.12.2021
PL01.12.2021
RO01.12.2021
RS01.12.2021
SE01.12.2021
SI01.12.2021
SK01.12.2021
SM01.12.2021
IE12.12.2021
LU12.12.2021
BE31.12.2021
CH31.12.2021
LI31.12.2021
BG01.03.2022
NO01.03.2022
GR02.03.2022
IS01.04.2022
PT01.04.2022
Former [2023/03]AL01.12.2021
AT01.12.2021
CZ01.12.2021
DK01.12.2021
EE01.12.2021
ES01.12.2021
FI01.12.2021
HR01.12.2021
LT01.12.2021
LV01.12.2021
MC01.12.2021
NL01.12.2021
PL01.12.2021
RO01.12.2021
RS01.12.2021
SE01.12.2021
SI01.12.2021
SK01.12.2021
SM01.12.2021
IE12.12.2021
LU12.12.2021
BE31.12.2021
CH31.12.2021
LI31.12.2021
BG01.03.2022
NO01.03.2022
GR02.03.2022
IS01.04.2022
PT01.04.2022
Former [2023/01]AL01.12.2021
AT01.12.2021
CZ01.12.2021
DK01.12.2021
EE01.12.2021
ES01.12.2021
FI01.12.2021
HR01.12.2021
LT01.12.2021
LV01.12.2021
MC01.12.2021
NL01.12.2021
PL01.12.2021
RO01.12.2021
RS01.12.2021
SE01.12.2021
SI01.12.2021
SK01.12.2021
SM01.12.2021
IE12.12.2021
LU12.12.2021
BE31.12.2021
BG01.03.2022
NO01.03.2022
GR02.03.2022
IS01.04.2022
PT01.04.2022
Former [2022/49]AL01.12.2021
AT01.12.2021
CZ01.12.2021
DK01.12.2021
EE01.12.2021
ES01.12.2021
FI01.12.2021
HR01.12.2021
LT01.12.2021
LV01.12.2021
MC01.12.2021
NL01.12.2021
PL01.12.2021
RO01.12.2021
RS01.12.2021
SE01.12.2021
SK01.12.2021
SM01.12.2021
IE12.12.2021
LU12.12.2021
BG01.03.2022
NO01.03.2022
GR02.03.2022
IS01.04.2022
PT01.04.2022
Former [2022/48]AT01.12.2021
CZ01.12.2021
DK01.12.2021
EE01.12.2021
ES01.12.2021
FI01.12.2021
HR01.12.2021
LT01.12.2021
LV01.12.2021
MC01.12.2021
NL01.12.2021
PL01.12.2021
RO01.12.2021
RS01.12.2021
SE01.12.2021
SK01.12.2021
SM01.12.2021
IE12.12.2021
LU12.12.2021
BG01.03.2022
NO01.03.2022
GR02.03.2022
IS01.04.2022
PT01.04.2022
Former [2022/46]AT01.12.2021
CZ01.12.2021
DK01.12.2021
EE01.12.2021
ES01.12.2021
FI01.12.2021
HR01.12.2021
LT01.12.2021
LV01.12.2021
MC01.12.2021
NL01.12.2021
PL01.12.2021
RO01.12.2021
RS01.12.2021
SE01.12.2021
SK01.12.2021
SM01.12.2021
LU12.12.2021
BG01.03.2022
NO01.03.2022
GR02.03.2022
IS01.04.2022
PT01.04.2022
Former [2022/42]AT01.12.2021
CZ01.12.2021
EE01.12.2021
ES01.12.2021
FI01.12.2021
HR01.12.2021
LT01.12.2021
LV01.12.2021
MC01.12.2021
NL01.12.2021
PL01.12.2021
RO01.12.2021
RS01.12.2021
SE01.12.2021
SK01.12.2021
SM01.12.2021
BG01.03.2022
NO01.03.2022
GR02.03.2022
IS01.04.2022
PT01.04.2022
Former [2022/39]AT01.12.2021
CZ01.12.2021
EE01.12.2021
ES01.12.2021
FI01.12.2021
HR01.12.2021
LT01.12.2021
LV01.12.2021
MC01.12.2021
NL01.12.2021
PL01.12.2021
RO01.12.2021
RS01.12.2021
SE01.12.2021
SK01.12.2021
SM01.12.2021
BG01.03.2022
NO01.03.2022
GR02.03.2022
PT01.04.2022
Former [2022/35]AT01.12.2021
CZ01.12.2021
EE01.12.2021
ES01.12.2021
FI01.12.2021
HR01.12.2021
LT01.12.2021
LV01.12.2021
NL01.12.2021
PL01.12.2021
RO01.12.2021
RS01.12.2021
SE01.12.2021
SK01.12.2021
SM01.12.2021
BG01.03.2022
NO01.03.2022
GR02.03.2022
PT01.04.2022
Former [2022/34]AT01.12.2021
EE01.12.2021
ES01.12.2021
FI01.12.2021
HR01.12.2021
LT01.12.2021
LV01.12.2021
NL01.12.2021
PL01.12.2021
RO01.12.2021
RS01.12.2021
SE01.12.2021
SM01.12.2021
BG01.03.2022
NO01.03.2022
GR02.03.2022
PT01.04.2022
Former [2022/33]AT01.12.2021
ES01.12.2021
FI01.12.2021
HR01.12.2021
LT01.12.2021
LV01.12.2021
NL01.12.2021
PL01.12.2021
RS01.12.2021
SE01.12.2021
SM01.12.2021
BG01.03.2022
NO01.03.2022
GR02.03.2022
Former [2022/30]AT01.12.2021
ES01.12.2021
FI01.12.2021
HR01.12.2021
LT01.12.2021
LV01.12.2021
NL01.12.2021
PL01.12.2021
RS01.12.2021
SE01.12.2021
BG01.03.2022
NO01.03.2022
GR02.03.2022
Former [2022/25]AT01.12.2021
ES01.12.2021
FI01.12.2021
HR01.12.2021
LT01.12.2021
LV01.12.2021
PL01.12.2021
RS01.12.2021
SE01.12.2021
BG01.03.2022
NO01.03.2022
GR02.03.2022
Former [2022/24]AT01.12.2021
ES01.12.2021
FI01.12.2021
HR01.12.2021
LT01.12.2021
LV01.12.2021
PL01.12.2021
RS01.12.2021
SE01.12.2021
BG01.03.2022
GR02.03.2022
Former [2022/23]AT01.12.2021
ES01.12.2021
FI01.12.2021
HR01.12.2021
LT01.12.2021
LV01.12.2021
PL01.12.2021
RS01.12.2021
BG01.03.2022
Former [2022/22]AT01.12.2021
FI01.12.2021
LT01.12.2021
RS01.12.2021
BG01.03.2022
Former [2022/21]AT01.12.2021
RS01.12.2021
BG01.03.2022
Former [2022/19]BG01.03.2022
Documents cited:Search[A]US2178955  (MAX DRAEMANN) [A] 1-10 * figure 1 *;
 [A]NL7000348  (UNIROYAL INC. [US]) [A] 1-10 * figure 2 *;
 [A]DE2051568  (BASF AG) [A] 1-10* figure 1 *;
 [A]US4642040  (FOX STEVE A [US]) [A] 1-10 * figure 1 *;
 [XA]US5909958  (RAUWENDAAL CHRIS J [US]) [X] 1,8 * abstract * * figure 2 * [A] 2-7,9,10
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.