Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3474476

EP3474476 - COMMUNICATION DEVICES AND METHODS WITH ONLINE PARAMETER CHANGE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  19.12.2019
Database last updated on 21.02.2020
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  01.11.2019
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.12.2019New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Lantiq Beteiligungs-GmbH & Co. KG
Lilienthalstraße 15
85579 Neubiberg / DE
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / SCHOPPMEIER, Dietmar
Malvenweg 18
82008 Unterhaching / DE
02 / SCHEDELBECK, Gert
Balanstrasse 9
81669 Munich / DE
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Sticht, Andreas
Kraus & Weisert
Patentanwälte PartGmbB
Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
80539 München / DE
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date18212300.003.09.2010
[2019/17]
Priority number, dateUS201033122410P04.05.2010         Original published format: US 33122410 P
US20108744471002.09.2010         Original published format: US 87444710
[2019/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3474476
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.03.2019
ClassificationInternational:H04L1/18, H04L5/00, H04M11/06, H04L1/00
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/49]
Former [2019/17]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:KOMMUNIKATIONSVORRICHTUNGEN UND -VERFAHREN MIT ONLINE-PARAMETERÄNDERUNG[2019/17]
English:COMMUNICATION DEVICES AND METHODS WITH ONLINE PARAMETER CHANGE[2019/17]
French:DISPOSITIFS ET PROCÉDÉS DE COMMUNICATION COMPORTANT UN CHANGEMENT DE PARAMÈTRE EN LIGNE[2019/17]
Examination procedure24.10.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
24.10.2019Examination requested  [2019/49]
24.10.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
20.12.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP10009173.5  / EP2385646
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
13.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
13.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
13.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
13.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
13.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 08
13.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 09
13.09.2019Renewal fee patent year 10
Documents cited:Search[A]US6842429  (SHRIDHAR AVADHANI [US], et al) [A] 1-23 * abstract * * column 2, line 23 - line 64 * * column 7, line 19 - line 44 * * column 8, line 66 - column 9, line 21 * * column 13, line 31 - column 14, line 40 * * column 22, line 60 - line 66 *;
 [A]US2009177938  (PONS JULIEN D [US], et al) [A] 1-23 * abstract * * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0035] * * paragraph [0113] - paragraph [0162] * * paragraph [0303] - paragraph [0310] * * paragraph [0268] *;
 [E]EP2299619  (LANTIQ DEUTSCHLAND GMBH [DE]) [E] 1-23 * the whole document *