Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3473191

EP3473191 - LIVING DONOR CANNULA [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been published
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 14.09.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.04.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Lifeline Scientific, Inc.
One Pierce Place Suite 475W
Itasca IL 60143 / US
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / KRAVITZ, David
c/o LIFELINE SCIENTIFIC, INC.
One Pierce Place, Suite 475W
Itasca, IL 60143 / US
02 / STEINMAN, Christopher
c/o LIFELINE SCIENTIFIC, INC.
One Pierce Place, Suite 475W
Itasca, IL 60143 / US
03 / PETTINATO, David
c/o LIFELINE SCIENTIFIC, INC.
One Pierce Place, Suite 475W
Itasca, IL 60143 / US
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Delorme, Nicolas , et al
Cabinet Germain & Maureau
BP 6153
69466 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date18212405.712.04.2012
[2019/17]
Priority number, dateUS20111309778929.04.2011         Original published format: US201113097789
US20111328316627.10.2011         Original published format: US201113283166
[2019/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3473191
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.03.2019
ClassificationInternational:A61B17/122, A01N1/02, A61M25/02, A61B17/34, A61M1/36
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
TitleGerman:KANÜLE FÜR LEBENDEN DONATOR[2019/17]
English:LIVING DONOR CANNULA[2019/17]
French:CANULE POUR DONNEUR VIVANT[2019/17]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP12715291.6  / EP2704644
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
13.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
13.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
13.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
13.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
15.04.2019Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[X]US2006217746  (KROLMAN ARTHUR M [US]) [X] 1-6 * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0039]; figures 4-9 *;
 [X]EP2218407  (TYCO HEALTHCARE [US]) [X] 1-6 * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0022]; figures 1-4 *;
 [X]US5496289  (WENSTROM JR RICHARD F [US]) [X] 1-6 * column 5, line 64 - column 6, line 22; figures 2-4, 8-12, 23-27, 34-35 * * column 7, line 66 - column 8, line 6 * * column 8, line 50 - column 9, line 26 * * column 10, line 18 - line 34 *;
 [XD]US2004111104  (SCHEIN DOUGLAS A [US] ET AL) [XD] 1-6 * paragraph [0045] - paragraph [0061]; figures 5-8 *;
 [X]WO2006105444  (MEDTRAIN TECHNOLOGIES LLC [US]; BANES ALBERT J [US]; WANG JIAN [US]; Q) [X] 1-3,5,6 * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0044]; figures 8-9, 10A-D, 14A-C * * paragraph [0048] *;
 [XA]WO2008017329  (UNOMEDICAL AS [DK]; GOERANSSON MAGNUS [SE]) [X] 1,2 * page 7, line 13 - page 9, line 17; figures 4-7 * [A] 4-6;
 [XI]US2011059429  (OWEN DONALD R [US] ET AL) [X] 1 * paragraph [0075] - paragraph [0077]; figures 18, 18A * [I] 2-6
by applicantUS5728115
 US2004111104
 US5149321
 US5395314
 US5584804
 US5709654
 US5752929
 US5338662
 US5494822
 US4745759
 US5217860
 US5472876
 US5051352
 US3995444
 US4629686
 US3738914
 US3892628
 US5285657
 US5476763
 US5157930
 US5141847
 US6014864
 US6183019
 US6241945
 US6485450
 US7678563
 US2004221719
 US19950484601