Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3474626

EP3474626 - METHODS AND NETWORK NODES FOR ACTIVATION OF CONNECTION CONFIGURATION FOR A SECONDARY BASE STATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 20.09.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip01.07.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ)
164 83 Stockholm / SE
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / WAGER, Stefan
Övergårdsvägen 41 D
02360 ESPOO / FI
02 / SUSITAIVAL, Riikka
Pohjoinen Rautatiekatu 17 B 14
00100 HELSINKI / FI
03 / VESELY, Alexander
Raabau 119
8330 FELDBACH / AT
04 / GUNNARSSON, Fredrik
Tinnerbäcksgränd 28
587 50 Linköping / SE
05 / CENTONZA, Angelo
Kristinebergsvägen 10, Apartment 1102
112 44 Stockholm / SE
06 / FOLKE, Mats
Rabattvägen 13
162 43 VÄLLINGBY / SE
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Ericsson
Patent Development
Torshamnsgatan 21-23
164 80 Stockholm / SE
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date18213002.119.06.2014
[2019/17]
Priority number, dateUS201361839408P26.06.2013         Original published format: US 201361839408 P
[2019/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3474626
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.03.2019
ClassificationInternational:H04W76/15, // H04W36/00, H04W56/00, H04W74/08, H04W76/11, H04W84/04
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND NETZWERKKNOTEN ZUR AKTIVIERUNG DER VERBINDUNGSKONFIGURATION FÜR EINE SEKUNDÄRBASISSTATION[2019/17]
English:METHODS AND NETWORK NODES FOR ACTIVATION OF CONNECTION CONFIGURATION FOR A SECONDARY BASE STATION[2019/17]
French:PROCÉDÉS ET NOEUDS DE RÉSEAU POUR ACTIVATION DE CONFIGURATION DE CONNEXION POUR UNE STATION DE BASE SECONDAIRE[2019/17]
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
17.12.2018Examination requested  [2019/17]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP14734961.7  / EP3014946
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
17.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
17.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
27.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[T]WO2014112803  (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [T] 1-14 * paragraph [0092] - paragraph [0094] * * paragraph [0131] - paragraph [0143] * * paragraph [0169] - paragraph [0186] * * figures 10,12,13 *
 [A]  - "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Radio Access Network; Evolved Universal Terrestrial Radio Access (E-UTRA); Study on Small Cell Enhancements for E-UTRA and E-UTRAN - Higher layer aspects (Release", 3GPP STANDARD; 3GPP TR 36.842, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20130602), vol. RAN WG2, no. V0.2.0, pages 1 - 38, XP050692536 [A] 1-14 * paragraph 7.1 * * paragraph 8.1.2 * * Figure 8.1.2.1-1 *
 [A]  - "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Radio Access Network; Evolved Universal Terrestrial Radio Access (E-UTRA) and Evolved Universal Terrestrial Radio Access Network (E-UTRAN); Overall description; Stage 2 (Release 11)", 3GPP STANDARD; 3GPP TS 36.300, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20130315), vol. RAN WG2, no. V11.5.0, pages 1 - 209, XP050692265 [A] 1-14 * paragraph 10.1.2.1.1 * * Figure 10.1.2.1.1-1 *
 [A]  - "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Radio Access Network; Evolved Universal Terrestrial Radio Access (E-UTRA); Radio Resource Control (RRC); Protocol specification (Release 11)", 3GPP STANDARD; 3GPP TS 36.331, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20130315), vol. RAN WG2, no. V11.3.0, pages 1 - 344, XP050692273 [A] 1-14 * paragraph 5.3.5.4 * * paragraph 5.3.10.3b *
 [A]  - CATT, "Discussion on U-plane delay", (20130510), 3GPP DRAFT; R2-131873 DISCUSSION ON U-PLANE DELAY, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG2_RL2/TSGR2_82/Docs/, (20130510), XP050699908 [A] 1-14 * Figure 2 * * page 4, lines 7-10 *