blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3498303

EP3498303 - METHODS OF PREPARATION OF CONJUGATES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  15.01.2021
Database last updated on 18.05.2024
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  20.04.2020
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  27.12.2019
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  17.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.01.2021Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 17.02.2021  [2021/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ImmunoGen, Inc.
830 Winter Street
Waltham, MA 02451 / US
[2019/25]
Inventor(s)01 / Fishkin, Nathan Elliott
21 Chisholm Road
Weymouth, MA 02190 / US
02 / Miller, Michael
4 Maymont Drive
Framingham, MA 01701 / US
03 / Li, Wei
6 Knowlton Drive
Acton, MA 01720 / US
04 / Singh, Rajeeva
17 Dartmouth Drive
Framingham, MA 01701 / US
 [2019/25]
Representative(s)McNab, Donald C.
Marks & Clerk LLP
40 Torphichen Street
Edinburgh EH3 8JB / GB
[2019/25]
Application number, filing date18213740.615.02.2012
[2019/25]
Priority number, dateUS201161443062P15.02.2011         Original published format: US 201161443062 P
US201161443092P15.02.2011         Original published format: US 201161443092 P
US201161483499P06.05.2011         Original published format: US 201161483499 P
[2019/25]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3498303
Date:19.06.2019
Language:EN
[2019/25]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.05.2019
ClassificationIPC:A61K47/68, C07D487/04, C07D519/00, A61P35/00
[2019/25]
CPC:
A61K31/5517 (EP,BR,CN,IL,KR,US); C07K16/30 (BR,IL,US); C07D487/04 (EP,BR,CN,IL,RU,US);
A61K47/545 (BR,IL,KR,US); A61K45/06 (BR,IL,US); A61K47/64 (KR);
A61K47/6803 (US); A61K47/68035 (EP,BR,CN,IL,KR,RU); A61K47/6849 (EP,BR,IL,KR,US);
A61K47/6851 (BR,IL,KR,US); A61K47/6867 (EP,BR,IL,KR,US); A61P35/00 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C07D519/00 (EP,BR,CN,IL,US); A61K2039/505 (BR,IL,KR,US); C07K2317/24 (BR,IL,KR,US);
C07K2317/92 (BR,IL,US); C07K2317/94 (BR,IL,KR,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2020/05]
Former [2019/25]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBA19.12.2019
ME19.12.2019
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON KONJUGATEN[2019/25]
English:METHODS OF PREPARATION OF CONJUGATES[2019/25]
French:PROCÉDÉS DE PRÉPARATION DE CONJUGUÉS[2019/25]
Examination procedure19.12.2019Examination requested  [2020/05]
19.12.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
23.04.2020Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.09.2020Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2021/07]
24.09.2020Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2021/07]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP12705761.0  / EP2675480
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
18.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
18.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
18.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
18.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
27.02.2019Renewal fee patent year 08
27.02.2020Renewal fee patent year 09
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[AD]EP2019104  (SANOFI AVENTIS [FR]) [AD] 1-3* examples 1-9 *;
 [AD]WO2010091150  (IMMUNOGEN INC [US], et al) [AD] 1-3 * examples 21, 36, *
by applicantWO9201047
 US5208020
 US5475092
 US5639641
 WO9906587
 US5885793
 US5969108
 WO0012508
 US6156746
 US6441163
 US6716821
 US2004132028
 WO2004069843
 US6913748
 US2005169933
 WO2005085260
 WO2007015280
 US2007082365
 US2007092940
 WO2007085930
 US7276497
 US7276499
 US2008050310
 US7342110
 US7368565
 US2008139791
 US7388026
 US2008171040
 US7414073
 US2008305044
 EP2019104
 US2009082274
 US7557189
 US2009274713
 WO2009134976
 US2010003641
 US2010003766
 US7723485
 US2010129314
 US2010203007
 US2010255056
 US2010316656
 US2011118146
 US2011224100
 US2012009181
    - STROME, S. E.; SAUSVILLE, E. A.; MANN, D., The Oncologist, (20070000), vol. 12, pages 1084 - 1095
    - A. D. RICART; A. W. TOLCHER, Nat. Clin. Pract. Oncol., (20070000), vol. 4, pages 245 - 255
    - LAMBERT, J., Drugs of the Future, (20100000), vol. 35, pages 471 - 480
    - J. Am. Chem. Soc., (19600000), vol. 82, page 5566
    - WILMAN, "Prodrugs in Cancer Chemotherapy", Biochemical Society Transactions, (19860000), vol. 14, pages 375 - 382
    - "Prodrugs: A Chemical Approach to Targeted Drug Delivery", STELLA et al., Directed Drug Delivery, Humana Press, (19850000), pages 247 - 267
    - BURGER, Medicinal Chemistry and Drug Discovery, (19950000), vol. 172-178, pages 949 - 982
    - ISALM; DENT, Bioconjugation, Groves Dictionaries Inc., (19990000), pages 218 - 363
    - PARHAM, J. Immunol., (19830000), vol. 131, pages 2895 - 2902
    - SPRING et al., J. Immunol., (19740000), vol. 113, pages 470 - 478
    - NISONOFF et al., Arch. Biochem. Biophys., (19600000), vol. 89, pages 230 - 244
    - KIM et al., Mol, Cancer Ther., (20080000), vol. 7, pages 2486 - 2497
    - CARTER, Nature Revs., (20060000), vol. 6, pages 343 - 357
    - BURGESS, Immunology Today, (19840000), vol. 5, pages 155 - 158
    - O'KEEFE et al., J. Biol. Chem., (19850000), vol. 260, pages 932 - 937
    - C. ZAHND et al., Cancer Res., (20100000), vol. 70, pages 1595 - 1605
    - J.D. GRIFFIN et al., Leukemia Res., (19840000), vol. 8, page 521
    - DEL ROSARIO, R. B. et al., Cancer Res. Suppl., (19900000), vol. 50, pages 804s - 808s
    - FRIEDMAN M., Int. J. Peptide Protein Res., (19740000), vol. 6, pages 183 - 185
    - MAK A., Anal. Biochem., (19780000), vol. 84, pages 432 - 440
    - MASRI M. S., J. Protein Chem., (19880000), vol. 7, pages 49 - 54
    - MORPURGO, M., Bioconjugate Chem., (19960000), vol. 7, pages 363 - 368
    - VOSKOGLOU-NOMIKOS et al., Clinical Cancer Res., (20030000), vol. 9, pages 42227 - 4239
 US20100307797
 US20100346595
 US20100413172
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.