Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3506134

EP3506134 - SHINGLED SOLAR CELL MODULE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  31.01.2020
Database last updated on 26.02.2020
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  31.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip31.01.2020The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established 
31.01.2020Request for examination filedpublished on 04.03.2020 [2020/10]
31.01.2020Change - designated statespublished on 04.03.2020 [2020/10]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SunPower Corporation
77 Rio Robles Drive
San Jose CA 95134 / US
[2019/27]
Inventor(s)01 / MORAD, Ratson
4157 Solana Drive
Palo Alto, CA 94306-3169 / US
02 / ALMOGY, Gilad
881 Northampton Drive
Palo Alto, CA 94303-3434 / US
03 / SUEZ, Itai
1641 Schooner Court
Santa Cruz, CA 95062-5700 / US
04 / HUMMEL, Jean
645 Prospect Street
San Carlos, CA 95065 / US
05 / BECKETT, Nathan
522 42nd Street
Oakland, CA 94609-2414 / US
06 / LIN, Yafu
3760 Tamarack Lane 52
Santa Clara, CA 95051 / US
07 / GANNON, John
6101 Hillegass Avenue
Oakland, CA 94618-1236 / US
08 / STARKEY, Michael J.
550 Moreland Way
Apt. 4515
Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US
09 / STUART, Robert
1055 Diamond Drive
Arcata, CA 95521 / US
10 / LANCE, Tamir
21478 Mary Alice Way
Los Gatos, CA 95033 / US
11 / MAYDAN, Dan
12000 Murietta Lane
Los Altos Hills, CA 94022-4342 / US
12 / HUMMEL, Jean
645 Prospect Street
San Carlos, CA 95065 / US
 [2019/27]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstraße 4
80802 München / DE
[2019/27]
Application number, filing date18215607.526.05.2015
[2019/27]
Priority number, dateUS201462003223P27.05.2014         Original published format: US 201462003223 P
US201462036215P12.08.2014         Original published format: US 201462036215 P
US201462035624P11.08.2014         Original published format: US 201462035624 P
US201462048858P11.09.2014         Original published format: US 201462048858 P
US201462064260P15.10.2014         Original published format: US 201462064260 P
US201462064834P16.10.2014         Original published format: US 201462064834 P
US201462042615P27.08.2014         Original published format: US 201462042615 P
US20141453229304.11.2014         Original published format: US201414532293
US20141453648607.11.2014         Original published format: US201414536486
US20141453954612.11.2014         Original published format: US201414539546
US20141454358017.11.2014         Original published format: US201414543580
US201462081200P18.11.2014         Original published format: US 201462081200 P
US20141454808119.11.2014         Original published format: US201414548081
US20141455067621.11.2014         Original published format: US201414550676
US20141453040531.10.2014         Original published format: US201414530405
US20141456057704.12.2014         Original published format: US201414560577
US20141456627810.12.2014         Original published format: US201414566278
US20141456582010.12.2014         Original published format: US201414565820
US20141457220616.12.2014         Original published format: US201414572206
US20141457759319.12.2014         Original published format: US201414577593
US20141458602530.12.2014         Original published format: US201414586025
US20141458591730.12.2014         Original published format: US201414585917
US20151459443912.01.2015         Original published format: US201514594439
US201562103816P15.01.2015         Original published format: US 201562103816 P
US20151460569526.01.2015         Original published format: US201514605695
US201562111757P04.02.2015         Original published format: US 201562111757 P
US201562113250P06.02.2015         Original published format: US 201562113250 P
US201562134176P17.03.2015         Original published format: US 201562134176 P
US20151467498331.03.2015         Original published format: US201514674983
US201562150426P21.04.2015         Original published format: US 201562150426 P
US201462082904P21.11.2014         Original published format: US 201462082904 P
US20141455276125.11.2014         Original published format: US201414552761
[2019/27]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP3506134
Date:03.07.2019
Language:EN
[2019/27]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP3506134
Date:31.07.2019
Language:EN
[2019/31]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.06.2019
ClassificationInternational:G06F17/50, G06Q10/04, G06Q50/06, H01L31/042, H01L31/05
[2019/27]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2020/10]
Former [2019/27]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:SCHINDELFÖRMIGES SOLARZELLENMODUL[2019/27]
English:SHINGLED SOLAR CELL MODULE[2019/27]
French:MODULE DE CELLULE SOLAIRE À BARDEAU[2019/27]
Examination procedure29.01.2020Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
29.01.2020Examination requested  [2020/10]
29.01.2020Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP15799148.0  / EP3149775
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
21.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
28.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[XAI]JPS63229766  (SHARP KK) [X] 1,4,8 * abstract * [A] 9 [I] 2,3;
 [XI]WO2008089657  (YI BINXUAN [CN]) [X] 1,4,8 * abstract * * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0030] * [I] 2,3;
 [A]JP2009130193  (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [A] 8 * abstract *;
 [A]US2008202584  (BASOL BULENT M [US]) [A] 8 * abstract *;
 [A]TW201120973  (IND TECH RES INST [TW]) [A] 8 * abstract *
by applicantUS2014124013
 US2014124014