Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3524116

EP3524116 - SWEEPING ROBOT AND CORRESPONDING CLEANING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  12.07.2019
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip02.08.2019Publication of search reportpublished on 04.09.2019  [2019/36]
02.08.2019Change - classificationpublished on 04.09.2019  [2019/36]
02.08.2019Change - classificationpublished on 04.09.2019  [2019/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
HiZero Technologies Co., Ltd
2/F, B Building, Dingxin Technology Park
Honglangbei 2nd Rd, Baoan District Shenzhen
518101 Guangdong / CN
[2019/33]
Inventor(s)01 / LI, Yang
2/F, B Building, Dingxin Technology Park
Honglangbei 2nd Rd, Baoan District
Shenzhen, 518101 / CN
 [2019/33]
Representative(s)Atkinson & Company Intellectual Property Limited
7 Moorgate Road
Rotherham S60 2BF / GB
[2019/33]
Application number, filing date18250024.928.09.2018
[2019/33]
Priority number, dateWO2018CN7668413.02.2018         Original published format: PCT/CN2018/076684
US20181605089631.07.2018         Original published format: US201816050896
[2019/33]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP3524116
Date:14.08.2019
Language:EN
[2019/33]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP3524116
Date:04.09.2019
Language:EN
[2019/36]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.08.2019
ClassificationInternational:A47L11/24, A47L11/40
[2019/33]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/33]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:KEHRROBOTER UND ENTSPRECHENDE REINIGUNGSVORRICHTUNG[2019/33]
English:SWEEPING ROBOT AND CORRESPONDING CLEANING DEVICE[2019/33]
French:ROBOT DE BALAYAGE ET DISPOSITIF DE NETTOYAGE CORRESPONDANT[2019/33]
Examination procedure04.10.2018Examination requested  [2019/33]
Documents cited:Search[X]DE2804702  (HUKUBA KOGYO KK) [X] 1,8,10 * pages 8-18; figures 1,2,5,7; claim - *;
 [X]CN202960388U  (LIN QINGJI) [X] 1,8,10,14 * paragraphs [0023] - [0037]; figure -; claim - *;
 [X]JPH0255027  (KUBOTA LTD) [X] 1,8,10,14 * the whole document *;
 [X]CN103393384  (UNIV SOOCHOW) [X] 1,8,10,14 * paragraphs [0030] - [0050]; figure -; claim - *;
 [X]CN107669214  (QINGENGYUN INTELLIGENT TECH SHENZHEN CO LTD) [X] 1,8,10,15 * paragraphs [0019] - [0025]; figure -; claim - *;
 [XI]CA2085267  (BELCOURT JOSEPH B [CA]) [X] 1,8,11,15 * pages 3-10; figure -; claim - * [I] 9,10,13;
 [X]CN204133379U  (CHEN GUOYING) [X] 1,8,10,15 * paragraphs [0019] - [0027]; figure -; claim - *;
 [X]CN105342528  (UNIV SOOCHOW) [X] 1,8,10,15 * paragraphs [0027] - [0041]; figure -; claim - *;
 [X]EP2641524  (NUOVE ELEGANZA INTERNAT HOLDING GROUP [PA]) [X] 1,2,8,10,14,15 * paragraphs [0016] - [0020]; figure -; claim - *;
 [X]JPH05123278  (ISHIKAWAJIMA HARIMA HEAVY IND) [X] 1,2,8,10,15 * paragraphs [0008] - [0025]; figure -; claim - *;
 [XI]CN203263303U  (LIN QINGJI) [X] 1,2,8-10,13,14 * paragraphs [0079] - [0094]; figures 7-11; claim - * [I] 11;
 [X]CN202341952U  (LINGFENG ZHU) [X] 1,2,8,10,15 * paragraphs [0017] - [0026]; figure -; claim - *;
 [X]CN201019680Y  (JUEWEI DU [CN]) [X] 1,2,8,14,15 * pages 7-12; figure -; claim - *;
 [X]EP3238598  (HIZERO TECH CO LTD [CN]) [X] 1-3,8,11,15 * paragraphs [0033] - [0066]; figures 1-11; claim - *