Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP3564144 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3564144



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 158
17.10.2018 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5
17.10.2018 Drawings Search / examination 6
17.10.2018 Description Search / examination 10
17.10.2018 Claims Search / examination 2
17.10.2018 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
17.10.2018 Abstract Search / examination 1
23.10.2018 Acknowledgement of receipt from National Office - R35(4) Search / examination 3
15.11.2018 Deficiency in designation of inventor Search / examination 1
16.04.2019 Search started Search / examination 1
25.04.2019 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
25.04.2019 European search report Search / examination 2
25.04.2019 European search opinion Search / examination 3
25.04.2019 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
24.07.2019 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
24.07.2019 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 3
24.07.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
24.07.2019 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
24.07.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
26.07.2019 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 24
26.07.2019 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 2
26.07.2019 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 6
26.07.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
26.07.2019 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 2
26.07.2019 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 6
26.07.2019 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 6
26.07.2019 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
26.07.2019 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
26.07.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
02.08.2019 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
02.08.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
02.08.2019 Designation of inventor Search / examination 2
02.08.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
13.09.2019 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 6
13.09.2019 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
23.09.2019 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
25.09.2019 Request for accelerated (early) publication Search / examination 1
25.09.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
25.09.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
09.10.2019 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
25.10.2019 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 13
25.10.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
25.10.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
11.11.2019 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
18.11.2019 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Search / examination 1
18.11.2019 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Search / examination 1
18.11.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
18.11.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
20.12.2019 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Search / examination 6
10.01.2020 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
27.01.2020 Means of redress Search / examination 1
27.01.2020 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Search / examination 9
27.01.2020 Decision Search / examination 1
27.01.2020 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
07.02.2020 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1