Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3564144

EP3564144 - FOOD CONTAINER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been published
Status updated on  04.10.2019
Database last updated on 21.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip26.01.2020New entry: Despatch of communication that application is refused 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Thaler, Stephen L.
1767 Waterfall Drive
St. Charles MO 63303 / US
[2019/45]
Representative(s)Williams Powell
11 Staple Inn
London WC1V 7QH / GB
[2019/45]
Application number, filing date18275163.617.10.2018
[2019/45]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3564144
Date:06.11.2019
Language:EN
[2019/45]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.04.2019
ClassificationInternational:B65D6/02, B65D8/00, B65D6/00, B65D13/02, B65D21/02, B65D1/02
[2019/45]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/45]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:LEBENSMITTELBEHÄLTER[2019/45]
English:FOOD CONTAINER[2019/45]
French:RÉCIPIENT ALIMENTAIRE[2019/45]
MiscellaneousEPB 2019/45: The designation of inventor does not meet the requirements laid down in Article 81 and Rule 19 EPC
Examination procedure26.07.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
25.11.2019Date of oral proceedings
20.12.2019Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
27.01.2020Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: Examination on filing A.90(5) {1}
Documents cited:Search[X]US5803301  (SATO KAZUHIRO [JP], et al) [X] 1,9,11,12 * column 2, line 42 - line 52 * * column 8, line 16 - line 23 *;
 [I]DE10004386  (EICHMANN JOSEF ALEXANDER [ZA]) [I] 1-12 * figure -; claim 1 *