Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3563896

EP3563896 - DEVICES AND METHODS FOR ATTRACTING ENHANCED ATTENTION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been published
Status updated on  04.10.2019
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip20.12.2019New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Thaler, Stephen L.
1767 Waterfall Drive
St. Charles MO 63303 / US
[2019/45]
Representative(s)Williams Powell
11 Staple Inn
London WC1V 7QH / GB
[2019/45]
Application number, filing date18275174.307.11.2018
[2019/45]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3563896
Date:06.11.2019
Language:EN
[2019/45]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.04.2019
ClassificationInternational:A61M21/00, A61M16/00
[2019/45]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/45]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR ANZIEHUNG ERHÖHTER AUFMERKSAMKEIT[2019/45]
English:DEVICES AND METHODS FOR ATTRACTING ENHANCED ATTENTION[2019/45]
French:DISPOSITIFS ET PROCÉDÉS POUR ATTIRER UNE ATTENTION ACCRUE[2019/45]
MiscellaneousEPB 2019/45: The designation of inventor does not meet the requirements laid down in Article 81 and Rule 19 EPC
Examination procedure30.07.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
25.11.2019Date of oral proceedings
20.12.2019Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Documents cited:Search[XI]WO9517854  (COGNITECH CORP [US]) [X] 1-3,10 * abstract * * page 11, paragraph 2 * * page 23, paragraph 4 - page 24, paragraph 2 * [I] 4-9,11-15;
 [XI]WO2010044708  (TETERINA TATYANA PROKHOROVNA [RU], et al) [X] 1,10 * abstract * [I] 2-9,11-15;
 [A]US2011276112  (SIMON BRUCE [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract *
by applicant   - TOVEE, MJ, "How fast is the speed of thought? Neuronal Processing", Current Biology, (19940000), vol. 4, no. 12, doi:doi:10.1016/S0960-9822(00)00253-0, pages 1125 - 1127, XP024248913

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0960-9822(00)00253-0
    - ZUEVA, MV, "Dynamic Fractal Flickering as a Tool in Research of Non-Linear Dynamics of the Evoked Activity of a Visual System and the Possible Basis for New Diagnostics and Treatment of Neurodegenerative Diseases of the Retina and Brain", World Appl. Sci. J., (20130000), vol. 27, no. 4, pages 462 - 468
    - THALER, SL, "Synaptic Perturbation and Consciousness", International Journal of Machine Consciousness, (20140000), vol. 06, no. 02, pages 75 - 107
    - "Cycles of Insanity and Creativity within Contemplative Neural Systems", THALER, SL, Medical Hypotheses, Elsevier, (20160000), vol. 94, pages 138 - 147
    - "Pattern Turnover within Synaptically Perturbed Neural Systems", THALER, SL, Procedia Computer Science, Elsevier, (20160000), vol. 88
    - THALER, SL; ZBIKOWSKI, K, "Cognitive Engines Contemplating Themselves", APA Newsletter on Philosophy and Computers, (20170000), vol. 17, no. 1