Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3473949

EP3473949 - DEMISTING INSTALLATION FOR A HOT-WATER HEATING CIRCUIT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  12.07.2019
Database last updated on 20.09.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.07.2019First examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bogos, Valéry
30, rue Jean Rey
78220 Viroflay / FR
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Degret, Jacques
Cabinet Degret 24, place du Général Catroux
75017 Paris / FR
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date18290010.001.02.2018
[2019/17]
Priority number, dateFR2017000010201.02.2017         Original published format: FR 1700102
[2019/17]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3473949
Date:24.04.2019
Language:FR
[2019/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.03.2019
ClassificationInternational:F24H9/00, F24D19/00, B08B9/032, F28G9/00
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:ANLAGE ZUR ENTNEBELUNG FÜR EINEN HEISSWASSER-HEIZKREIS[2019/17]
English:DEMISTING INSTALLATION FOR A HOT-WATER HEATING CIRCUIT[2019/17]
French:INSTALLATION DE DÉSEMBOUAGE POUR UN CIRCUIT DE CHAUFFAGE PAR EAU CHAUDE[2019/17]
Examination procedure23.02.2018Examination requested  [2019/17]
27.03.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
17.07.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
Documents cited:Search[YA]FR2752614  (GENDRE FRANCIS [FR]) [Y] 1-6,8-13 * figures 1/3-3/3 * [A] 7;
 [YA]US4919154  (ENGLE THOMAS B [US]) [Y] 1-6,8-13 * column 4, line 53 - column 5, line 8 * [A] 7;
 [A]WO8803065  (SUNDHOLM GOERAN [FI]) [A] 1-10 * figures 1,2 *;
 [A]DE3902366  (PANNENBORG JENS [DE]) [A] 1-10 * figures 1,2 *;
 [YDA]EP1099488  (PROGALVA NET ET 9 [FR]) [YD] 9,10 * the whole document * [A] 1;
 [A]US8628628  (BONNER MICHAEL R [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * figure 1 *