Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP3524296


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
10.09.2019 New entry: Despatch of communication that application is refused
12.07.2019 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  14.08.2019  [2019/33]
18.03.2019 Change - representative
20.02.2018 Change - representative