Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3471273

EP3471273 - APPROXIMATION OF SAMPLES OF A DIGITAL SIGNAL REDUCING A NUMBER OF SIGNIFICANT BITS ACCORDING TO VALUES OF THE SAMPLES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  18.10.2019
Database last updated on 11.12.2019
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip18.10.2019The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established 
18.10.2019Request for examination filedpublished on 20.11.2019  [2019/47]
18.10.2019Change - designated statespublished on 20.11.2019  [2019/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ACOUSTICAL BEAUTY
Loirecopark I Route d' Aubigné Racan
72500 VAAS / FR
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / MILOT, Gilles
4 rue Ernest Lavisse
75012 PARIS / FR
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Bell, Mark
Marks & Clerk France
Immeuble «Visium»
22, avenue Aristide Briand
94117 Arcueil Cedex / FR
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date18305545.802.05.2018
[2019/16]
Priority number, dateEP2017030640116.10.2017         Original published format: EP 17306401
EP2018030501108.01.2018         Original published format: EP 18305011
[2019/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3471273
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/16]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.11.2018
ClassificationInternational:H03M7/30, H03M1/70
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/47]
Former [2019/16]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:ANNÄHERUNG VON ABTASTWERTEN EINES DIGITALEN SIGNALS DURCH REDUKTION DER ANZAHL VON SIGNIFIKANTEN BITS ENTSPRECHEND DEN WERTEN DER ABTASTWERTE[2019/16]
English:APPROXIMATION OF SAMPLES OF A DIGITAL SIGNAL REDUCING A NUMBER OF SIGNIFICANT BITS ACCORDING TO VALUES OF THE SAMPLES[2019/16]
French:APPROXIMATION D'ÉCHANTILLONS D'UN SIGNAL NUMÉRIQUE RÉDUISANT UN NOMBRE DE BITS SIGNIFICATIFS SELON LES VALEURS DES ÉCHANTILLONS[2019/16]
Examination procedure14.10.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
14.10.2019Examination requested  [2019/47]
14.10.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2008030577  (CLEARY GEOFFREY ALAN [US], et al) [X] 1,16-20 * paragraphs [0021] - [0033]; figures 3-5 * [I] 2-15;
 [XI]WO0158022  (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [X] 1,16-20 * pages 3-7; figures 1-12 * [I] 2-15;
 [XI]US5977896  (KOHDAKA TAKAYUKI [JP], et al) [X] 1,16-20 * columns 3-6; figures 1,8 * [I] 2-15
by applicantEP20170306401