Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP3471273 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3471273



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 448
14.10.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
14.10.2019 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
14.10.2019 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
14.10.2019 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 76
14.10.2019 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 76
14.10.2019 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 6
14.10.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
24.04.2019 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
20.03.2019 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
26.11.2018 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
26.11.2018 European search opinion Search / examination 5
26.11.2018 European search report Search / examination 2
26.11.2018 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
21.11.2018 Priority search results copy provided by EPO Search / examination 7
21.11.2018 Priority search results copy provided by EPO Search / examination 7
09.07.2018 Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document Search / examination 1
03.07.2018 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 72
03.07.2018 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 70
15.05.2018 Acknowledgement of receipt from National Office - R35(4) Search / examination 2
02.05.2018 Abstract Search / examination 1
02.05.2018 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 1
02.05.2018 Claims Search / examination 4
02.05.2018 Description Search / examination 76
02.05.2018 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
02.05.2018 Drawings Search / examination 18
02.05.2018 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5