Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP3471273


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
18.10.2019 The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established
18.10.2019 Request for examination filed published on  20.11.2019  [2019/47]
18.10.2019 Change - designated states published on  20.11.2019  [2019/47]
16.10.2019 Amendment by applicant
15.03.2019 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  17.04.2019  [2019/16]
09.05.2018 Change - representative