blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP3471273 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

EP17306401 EP18305011 EP18305545 EP18305546



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
WO2019076784Global Dossier 25.04.2019A1
Priority number Date
EP18305546 02.05.2018
EP17306401 16.10.2017
EP18305011 08.01.2018
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
WO2019076783Global Dossier 25.04.2019A1
Priority number Date
EP18305545 02.05.2018
EP17306401 16.10.2017
EP18305011 08.01.2018
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP3471272Global Dossier 17.04.2019A1
Priority number Date
EP17306401 16.10.2017
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP3471271Global Dossier 17.04.2019A1
Priority number Date
EP17306401 16.10.2017
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2019076781Global Dossier 25.04.2019A1
Priority number Date
EP17306401 16.10.2017
EP18305011 08.01.2018
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP3471274Global Dossier 17.04.2019A1
Priority number Date
EP17306401 16.10.2017
EP18305011 08.01.2018
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP3471273Global Dossier 17.04.2019A1
Priority number Date
EP17306401 16.10.2017
EP18305011 08.01.2018