EP3603626 - COMPOSITION FOR USE IN THE PREVENTION AND/OR TREATMENT OF THE GENITOURINARY MUCOSA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.01.2021 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 03.01.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.01.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.02.2021 [2021/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mucosa Innovations, S.L. C/ Araquil 11 28023 Madrid / ES | [2020/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RODRIGUEZ VILABOA, Deborah Calle Araquil, 11 28023 MADRID / ES | [2020/06] | Representative(s) | Herrero & Asociados, S.L. Edificio Aqua - Agustín de Foxá, 4-10 28036 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2020/06] | Herrero & Asociados, S.L. Cedaceros, 1 28014 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 18382576.9 | 31.07.2018 | [2020/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3603626 | Date: | 05.02.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.11.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/047, A61K31/205, A61P15/02, A61K36/63 | [2020/06] | CPC: |
A61K31/047 (EP,CN,US);
A61K36/32 (CN);
A61K36/63 (EP,US);
A61K31/198 (CN);
A61K31/205 (EP,US);
A61K47/36 (CN);
A61K9/0034 (CN);
A61K9/06 (CN);
A61P13/00 (CN);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/047, A61K2300/00 (CN);
A61K31/198, A61K2300/00 (CN);
A61K36/32, A61K2300/00 (CN)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/06] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUR VERWENDUNG BEI DER VORBEUGUNG UND/ODER BEHANDLUNG VON UROGENITALMUKOSA | [2020/06] | English: | COMPOSITION FOR USE IN THE PREVENTION AND/OR TREATMENT OF THE GENITOURINARY MUCOSA | [2020/06] | French: | COMPOSÉS DESTINÉS À UNE UTILISATION DANS LA PRÉVENTION ET/OU LE TRAITEMENT DE LA MUQUEUSE GÉNITO-URINAIRE | [2020/06] | Examination procedure | 06.08.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/07] | 14.09.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2021/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1444984 (B S D BIO SCIENCE DEV SNC DI O [IT]) [A] 1-15* paragraphs [0020] , [0 24]; claim - *; | [A] - SANTIAGO PALACIOS ET AL, "Update on management of genitourinary syndrome of menopause: A practical guide", MATURITAS, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20151101), vol. 82, no. 3, doi:10.1016/j.maturitas.2015.07.020, ISSN 0378-5122, pages 308 - 313, XP055510740 [A] 1-15 * page 309 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.maturitas.2015.07.020 | [A] - MARTÍN MARGARITA ET AL, "Products based on olive oil, betaine, and xylitol in the post-radiotherapy xerostomia", REPORTS OF PRACTICAL ONCOLOGY AND RADIOTHERAPY, (20161125), vol. 22, no. 1, doi:10.1016/J.RPOR.2016.09.008, ISSN 1507-1367, pages 71 - 76, XP029866080 [A] 1-15 * page 71 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.rpor.2016.09.008 | by applicant | WO0247692 | WO2007085020 | US8540970 | - PORTMAN DJ; GASS ML, "Vulvovaginal atrophy terminology consensus conference panel. Genitourinary syndrome of menopause: new terminology for vulvovaginal atrophy from the international society for the study of women's sexual health and the North American Menopause Society", J Sex Med., (20141200), vol. 11, no. 12, pages 2865 - 72 |