blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3566410

EP3566410 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR A LOW-LATENCY AUDIO TRANSMISSION IN A MOBILE COMMUNICATIONS NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.03.2021
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  10.04.2020
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  18.12.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  11.10.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  13.07.2018
Formerunknown
Status updated on  17.01.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip03.05.2024Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sennheiser electronic GmbH & Co. KG
Am Labor 1
30900 Wedemark / DE
[2019/46]
Inventor(s)01 / HAUSTEIN, Thomas
Zum Reiherstand 2
14469 Potsdam / DE
02 / WIERUCH, Dennis
c/o Fraunhofer HHI - Heinrich-Hertz-Institute
Einsteinufer 37
10587 Berlin / DE
03 / WIRTH, Thomas
Gritznerstraße 33
12163 Berlin / DE
04 / KRÜGER, Udo
Hertelstraße 1
12161 Berlin / DE
05 / GEORGI, Sebastian
Veilchenstraße 30
30853 Langenhangen / DE
06 / WATERMANN, Jan
Goebenstraße 43
30161 Hannover / DE
 [2020/19]
Former [2019/46]01 / HAUSTEIN, Thomas
Zum Reiherstand 2
14469 Potsdam / DE
02 / WIERUCH, Dennis
c/o Fraunhofer HHI
Heinrich Hertz Institute
Einsteinufer 37
10587 Berlin / DE
03 / WIRTH, Thomas
Gritznerstraße 33
12163 Berlin / DE
04 / KRÜGER, Udo
Hertelstraße 1
12161 Berlin / DE
05 / GEORGI, Sebastian
Veilchenstraße 30
30851 Langenhangen / DE
06 / WATERMANN, Jan
Goebenstraße 43
30161 Hannover / DE
Representative(s)Eisenführ Speiser
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB
Postfach 10 60 78
28060 Bremen / DE
[2019/46]
Application number, filing date18700084.902.01.2018
[2019/46]
WO2018EP50005
Priority number, dateDE20171010007604.01.2017         Original published format: DE102017100076
[2019/46]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2018127466
Date:12.07.2018
Language:DE
[2018/28]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3566410
Date:13.11.2019
Language:DE
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.07.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2019/46]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3566410
Date:13.05.2020
Language:DE
[2020/20]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP12.07.2018
ClassificationIPC:H04L29/06, H04W92/00
[2019/46]
CPC:
H04L65/80 (EP,US); H04L65/70 (EP,US); H04L5/0007 (US);
H04L69/04 (US)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/46]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR LATENZARMEN AUDIOÜBERTRAGUNG IN EINEM MOBILFUNK-NETZWERK[2019/46]
English:METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR A LOW-LATENCY AUDIO TRANSMISSION IN A MOBILE COMMUNICATIONS NETWORK[2019/46]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME DE TRANSMISSION AUDIO À FAIBLE LATENCE DANS UN RÉSEAU MOBILE[2019/46]
Entry into regional phase20.09.2018National basic fee paid 
20.09.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
20.09.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.09.2018Examination requested  [2019/46]
20.09.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
02.11.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
19.12.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
31.03.2020Fee for grant paid
31.03.2020Fee for publishing/printing paid
31.03.2020Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)16.02.2021No opposition filed within time limit [2021/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.01.2020Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU02.01.2018
AL13.05.2020
CY13.05.2020
CZ13.05.2020
DK13.05.2020
EE13.05.2020
ES13.05.2020
FI13.05.2020
HR13.05.2020
IT13.05.2020
LT13.05.2020
LV13.05.2020
MC13.05.2020
MK13.05.2020
NL13.05.2020
PL13.05.2020
RO13.05.2020
RS13.05.2020
SE13.05.2020
SI13.05.2020
SK13.05.2020
SM13.05.2020
BG13.08.2020
NO13.08.2020
GR14.08.2020
IS13.09.2020
PT14.09.2020
IE02.01.2021
LU02.01.2021
BE31.01.2021
CH31.01.2021
LI31.01.2021
[2024/23]
Former [2023/41]HU02.01.2018
AL13.05.2020
CY13.05.2020
CZ13.05.2020
DK13.05.2020
EE13.05.2020
ES13.05.2020
FI13.05.2020
HR13.05.2020
IT13.05.2020
LT13.05.2020
LV13.05.2020
MC13.05.2020
NL13.05.2020
PL13.05.2020
RO13.05.2020
RS13.05.2020
SE13.05.2020
SI13.05.2020
SK13.05.2020
SM13.05.2020
BG13.08.2020
NO13.08.2020
GR14.08.2020
IS13.09.2020
PT14.09.2020
IE02.01.2021
LU02.01.2021
BE31.01.2021
CH31.01.2021
LI31.01.2021
Former [2023/33]HU02.01.2018
AL13.05.2020
CY13.05.2020
CZ13.05.2020
DK13.05.2020
EE13.05.2020
ES13.05.2020
FI13.05.2020
HR13.05.2020
IT13.05.2020
LT13.05.2020
LV13.05.2020
MC13.05.2020
NL13.05.2020
PL13.05.2020
RO13.05.2020
RS13.05.2020
SE13.05.2020
SK13.05.2020
SM13.05.2020
BG13.08.2020
NO13.08.2020
GR14.08.2020
IS13.09.2020
PT14.09.2020
IE02.01.2021
LU02.01.2021
BE31.01.2021
CH31.01.2021
LI31.01.2021
Former [2023/30]AL13.05.2020
CY13.05.2020
CZ13.05.2020
DK13.05.2020
EE13.05.2020
ES13.05.2020
FI13.05.2020
HR13.05.2020
IT13.05.2020
LT13.05.2020
LV13.05.2020
MC13.05.2020
NL13.05.2020
PL13.05.2020
RO13.05.2020
RS13.05.2020
SE13.05.2020
SK13.05.2020
SM13.05.2020
BG13.08.2020
NO13.08.2020
GR14.08.2020
IS13.09.2020
PT14.09.2020
IE02.01.2021
LU02.01.2021
BE31.01.2021
CH31.01.2021
LI31.01.2021
Former [2022/33]AL13.05.2020
CZ13.05.2020
DK13.05.2020
EE13.05.2020
ES13.05.2020
FI13.05.2020
HR13.05.2020
IT13.05.2020
LT13.05.2020
LV13.05.2020
MC13.05.2020
NL13.05.2020
PL13.05.2020
RO13.05.2020
RS13.05.2020
SE13.05.2020
SK13.05.2020
SM13.05.2020
BG13.08.2020
NO13.08.2020
GR14.08.2020
IS13.09.2020
PT14.09.2020
IE02.01.2021
LU02.01.2021
BE31.01.2021
CH31.01.2021
LI31.01.2021
Former [2022/07]AL13.05.2020
CZ13.05.2020
DK13.05.2020
EE13.05.2020
ES13.05.2020
FI13.05.2020
HR13.05.2020
IT13.05.2020
LT13.05.2020
LV13.05.2020
MC13.05.2020
NL13.05.2020
PL13.05.2020
RO13.05.2020
RS13.05.2020
SE13.05.2020
SK13.05.2020
SM13.05.2020
BG13.08.2020
NO13.08.2020
GR14.08.2020
IS13.09.2020
PT14.09.2020
IE02.01.2021
LU02.01.2021
CH31.01.2021
LI31.01.2021
Former [2021/52]AL13.05.2020
CZ13.05.2020
DK13.05.2020
EE13.05.2020
ES13.05.2020
FI13.05.2020
HR13.05.2020
IT13.05.2020
LT13.05.2020
LV13.05.2020
MC13.05.2020
NL13.05.2020
PL13.05.2020
RO13.05.2020
RS13.05.2020
SE13.05.2020
SK13.05.2020
SM13.05.2020
BG13.08.2020
NO13.08.2020
GR14.08.2020
IS13.09.2020
PT14.09.2020
LU02.01.2021
CH31.01.2021
LI31.01.2021
Former [2021/43]AL13.05.2020
CZ13.05.2020
DK13.05.2020
EE13.05.2020
ES13.05.2020
FI13.05.2020
HR13.05.2020
IT13.05.2020
LT13.05.2020
LV13.05.2020
MC13.05.2020
NL13.05.2020
PL13.05.2020
RO13.05.2020
RS13.05.2020
SE13.05.2020
SK13.05.2020
SM13.05.2020
BG13.08.2020
NO13.08.2020
GR14.08.2020
IS13.09.2020
PT14.09.2020
LU02.01.2021
Former [2021/40]AL13.05.2020
CZ13.05.2020
DK13.05.2020
EE13.05.2020
ES13.05.2020
FI13.05.2020
HR13.05.2020
IT13.05.2020
LT13.05.2020
LV13.05.2020
MC13.05.2020
NL13.05.2020
PL13.05.2020
RO13.05.2020
RS13.05.2020
SE13.05.2020
SK13.05.2020
SM13.05.2020
BG13.08.2020
NO13.08.2020
GR14.08.2020
IS13.09.2020
PT14.09.2020
Former [2021/10]AL13.05.2020
CZ13.05.2020
DK13.05.2020
EE13.05.2020
ES13.05.2020
FI13.05.2020
HR13.05.2020
IT13.05.2020
LT13.05.2020
LV13.05.2020
NL13.05.2020
PL13.05.2020
RO13.05.2020
RS13.05.2020
SE13.05.2020
SK13.05.2020
SM13.05.2020
BG13.08.2020
NO13.08.2020
GR14.08.2020
IS13.09.2020
PT14.09.2020
Former [2021/09]AL13.05.2020
CZ13.05.2020
DK13.05.2020
EE13.05.2020
ES13.05.2020
FI13.05.2020
HR13.05.2020
IT13.05.2020
LT13.05.2020
LV13.05.2020
NL13.05.2020
RO13.05.2020
RS13.05.2020
SE13.05.2020
SM13.05.2020
BG13.08.2020
NO13.08.2020
GR14.08.2020
IS13.09.2020
PT14.09.2020
Former [2021/08]AL13.05.2020
DK13.05.2020
ES13.05.2020
FI13.05.2020
HR13.05.2020
LT13.05.2020
LV13.05.2020
NL13.05.2020
RO13.05.2020
RS13.05.2020
SE13.05.2020
SM13.05.2020
BG13.08.2020
NO13.08.2020
GR14.08.2020
IS13.09.2020
PT14.09.2020
Former [2021/04]AL13.05.2020
FI13.05.2020
HR13.05.2020
LT13.05.2020
LV13.05.2020
NL13.05.2020
RS13.05.2020
SE13.05.2020
BG13.08.2020
NO13.08.2020
GR14.08.2020
IS13.09.2020
PT14.09.2020
Former [2021/01]FI13.05.2020
HR13.05.2020
LT13.05.2020
LV13.05.2020
RS13.05.2020
SE13.05.2020
BG13.08.2020
NO13.08.2020
GR14.08.2020
IS13.09.2020
PT14.09.2020
Former [2020/51]FI13.05.2020
HR13.05.2020
LT13.05.2020
LV13.05.2020
RS13.05.2020
SE13.05.2020
NO13.08.2020
GR14.08.2020
IS13.09.2020
PT14.09.2020
Former [2020/50]FI13.05.2020
HR13.05.2020
LT13.05.2020
LV13.05.2020
SE13.05.2020
NO13.08.2020
GR14.08.2020
IS13.09.2020
PT14.09.2020
Former [2020/48]FI13.05.2020
LT13.05.2020
SE13.05.2020
NO13.08.2020
IS13.09.2020
PT14.09.2020
Former [2020/47]LT13.05.2020
NO13.08.2020
IS13.09.2020
Former [2020/46]IS13.09.2020
Cited inInternational search[A]EP3021628  (KYOCERA CORP [JP]) [A] 1-18 * abstract ** paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0164]; figures 1-9 *;
 [A]DE102015210873  (SENNHEISER ELECTRONIC GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1-18 * abstract * * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0035]; figures 1-3 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.