blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3574302

EP3574302 - INFLAMMATORY MARKER MEASUREMENT METHOD, INFLAMMATORY MARKER MEASUREMENT APPARATUS, INFLAMMATORY MARKER MEASUREMENT PROGRAM, AND RECORDING MEDIUM STORING THE PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  09.02.2024
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  10.10.2023
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  08.07.2021
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  01.11.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  04.08.2018
Formerunknown
Status updated on  22.02.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip09.02.2024(Expected) grantpublished on 13.03.2024  [2024/11]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nihon Kohden Corporation
31-4, Nishiochiai 1-chome
Shinjuku-ku
Tokyo 161-8560 / JP
[2019/49]
Inventor(s)01 / HIGUCHI, Makoto
c/o Nihon Kohden Corporation
1-6, Kusunokidai 1-Chome
Tokorozawa-shi Saitama 359-0037 / JP
 [2019/49]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstraße 4
80802 München / DE
[2019/49]
Application number, filing date18704318.725.01.2018
[2019/49]
WO2018JP02311
Priority number, dateJP2017001329227.01.2017         Original published format: JP 2017013292
JP2017019539305.10.2017         Original published format: JP 2017195393
[2019/49]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2018139546
Date:02.08.2018
Language:EN
[2018/31]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3574302
Date:04.12.2019
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.08.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2019/49]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3574302
Date:13.03.2024
Language:EN
[2024/11]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP02.08.2018
ClassificationIPC:G01N15/05, G01N33/49, A61B5/145, G01N15/06, G01N33/80, G01N15/00, A61B5/1455
[2023/44]
CPC:
A61B5/1455 (EP); G01N15/06 (EP,US); A61B5/14535 (EP);
G01N33/80 (EP); G01N15/075 (EP,US); G01N2015/0092 (EP,US);
G01N2015/012 (EP,US); G01N2015/055 (EP,US); G01N2015/0687 (EP);
G01N2333/75 (EP); G01N2800/7095 (EP,US); G01N33/49 (EP,US) (-)
Former IPC [2019/49]G01N15/05, A61B5/1455, G01N33/49
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/49]  
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:INFLAMMATORISCHES MARKER-MESSVERFAHREN, -MESSGERÄT, -PROGRAMM UND AUFZEICHNUNGSMEDIUM, DAS DAS PROGRAMM AUFBEWAHRT[2023/44]
English:INFLAMMATORY MARKER MEASUREMENT METHOD, INFLAMMATORY MARKER MEASUREMENT APPARATUS, INFLAMMATORY MARKER MEASUREMENT PROGRAM, AND RECORDING MEDIUM STORING THE PROGRAM[2019/49]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE MESURE DE MARQUEUR INFLAMMATOIRE, APPAREIL DE MESURE DE MARQUEUR INFLAMMATOIRE, PROGRAMME DE MESURE DE MARQUEUR INFLAMMATOIRE ET SUPPORT D'ENREGISTREMENT STOCKANT LE PROGRAMME[2023/44]
Former [2019/49]ENTZÜNDUNGSMARKERMESSVERFAHREN, ENTZÜNDUNGSMARKERMESSVORRICHTUNG, ENTZÜNDUNGSMARKERMESSPROGRAMM UND AUFZEICHNUNGSMEDIUM MIT DARAUF GESPEICHERTEM PROGRAMM
Former [2019/49]PROCÉDÉ, APPAREIL ET PROGRAMME DE MESURE DE MARQUEUR INFLAMMATOIRE, ET SUPPORT D'ENREGISTREMENT POUR LE STOCKAGE DU PROGRAMME
Entry into regional phase26.07.2019National basic fee paid 
26.07.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
26.07.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.11.2018Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
26.07.2019Examination requested  [2019/49]
26.07.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
05.03.2020Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
07.07.2021Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.11.2021Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.02.2023Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.06.2023Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.10.2023Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.02.2024Fee for grant paid
05.02.2024Fee for publishing/printing paid
05.02.2024Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.01.2020Renewal fee patent year 03
13.01.2021Renewal fee patent year 04
17.12.2021Renewal fee patent year 05
14.12.2022Renewal fee patent year 06
14.12.2023Renewal fee patent year 07
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[Y]WO2007128684  (SIRE ANALYTICAL SYSTEMS SRL [IT], et al) [Y] 3,7 * abstract * * page 6, line 23 - page 7, line 12 * * figures 2,4 * * claims 1-7 *;
 [XY]WO2008006897  (SIRE ANALYTICAL SYSTEMS SRL [IT], et al) [X] 1,2,4-6,8 * abstract * * page 1, line 18 - line 26 * * page 12, line 1 - line 10 * * claims 1-23 * [Y] 1-13;
 [A]WO2011101815  (BASKURT OGUZ KERIM [TR]) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2014315240  (DAYEL MARK [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *;
 [Y]US2015268221  (FUKUDA HIROYUKI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-13 * abstract * * paragraphs [0008] - [0012] - [0035] - [0059] - [0074] * * figures 3-5 * * claims 1-17 *;
 [A]  - ONG P.K. ET AL., "Study of time-dependent characteristics of a syllectogram in the presence of aggregation inhibition", INT. J. PRECISION ENGINEER. MANUFACTUR., (201203), vol. 13, no. 3, pages 421 - 428, XP055467169 [A] 1-13 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s12541-012-0054-y
 [A]  - PRIBUSH A. ET AL., "A novel approach for assessments of erythrocyte sedimentation rate", INT. J. LAB. HEMATOL., (201012), vol. 33, no. 3, pages 251 - 257, XP055100088 [A] 1-13 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1751-553X.2010.01277.x
 [A]  - ZHBANOV A. ET AL., "Effects of aggregation on blood sedimentation and conductivity", PLOS ONE, (20150605), vol. 10, no. 6, pages 1 - 25, XP055467156 [A] 1-13 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pone.0129337
 [A]  - DOBBE J.G.G. ET AL., "Syllectometry: The effect of aggregometer geometry in the assessment of red blood cell shape recovery and aggregation", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON BIOMEDICAL ENGINEERING, (200301), vol. 50, no. 1, XP011070468 [A] 1-13 * the whole document *
by applicant   - Clin Chem Lab Med, (20100000), vol. 48, no. 7, pages 1043 - 1048
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.