Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3552121

EP3552121 - OPPORTUNISTIC USE OF STREAMS FOR STORING DATA ON A SOLID STATE DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  13.09.2019
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  25.08.2018
Formerunknown
Status updated on  03.03.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip13.09.2019Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletinpublished on 16.10.2019  [2019/42]
13.09.2019The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established 
13.09.2019Request for examination filedpublished on 16.10.2019  [2019/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US
[2019/42]
Inventor(s)01 / DAS, Rajsekhar
Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US
02 / LEE, Scott Chao-Chueh
Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US
03 / LEE, Chesong
Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US
04 / GRIFFITH, Tristan C.
Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US
05 / TIPTON, William R.
Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US
06 / SCHMIDT, Erik
Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US
 [2019/42]
Representative(s)Townsend, Martyn
Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street
London WC1N 2BF / GB
[2019/42]
Application number, filing date18706353.206.02.2018
[2019/42]
WO2018US16937
Priority number, dateUS201762459426P15.02.2017         Original published format: US 201762459426 P
US20171562899421.06.2017         Original published format: US201715628994
[2019/42]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2018151969
Date:23.08.2018
Language:EN
[2018/34]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3552121
Date:16.10.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.08.2018
[2019/42]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP23.08.2018
ClassificationInternational:G06F17/30
[2019/42]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/42]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:OPPORTUNISTISCHE VERWENDUNG VON STRÖMEN ZUR SPEICHERUNG VON DATEN AUF EINER FESTKÖRPERVORRICHTUNG[2019/42]
English:OPPORTUNISTIC USE OF STREAMS FOR STORING DATA ON A SOLID STATE DEVICE[2019/42]
French:UTILISATION OPPORTUNISTE DE FLUX POUR STOCKER DES DONNÉES SUR UN DISPOSITIF À SEMI-CONDUCTEURS[2019/42]
Entry into regional phase09.07.2019National basic fee paid 
09.07.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
09.07.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.07.2019Examination requested  [2019/42]
09.07.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Cited inInternational search[I]US2010169588  (SINCLAIR ALAN W [GB]) [I] 1-15 * page 5 *;
 [I]US2016266792  (AMAKI TAKEHIKO [JP], et al) [I] 1-15 * page 1 - page 9 *;
 [A]  - Anonymous, "Write amplification - Wikipedia", (20161212), URL: https://en.wikipedia.org/w/index.php?title=Write_amplification&oldid=754352450, (20180322), XP055462181 [A] 1-15 * the whole document *